Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 294 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18097 Week
» 71113 Month
» 190640 Year
» 3217493 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6573 |
04/11/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
33055 |
12/1973 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
04/11/1961 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
02/1968 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 01/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
04/11/1961 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
03/04/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Electrical insulation |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/11/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6573 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company Allocated to Hither Green (73C) Livery applied: Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
|
|
10/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
15/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
01/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 33055 |
|
|
24/12/1989 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 33055 |
|
|
08/08/1991 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|