Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1890 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19693 Week
» 72709 Month
» 192236 Year
» 3219089 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6580 |
09/12/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
33119 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
09/12/1961 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1967 |
|
Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/12/1961 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
05/1967 |
xep |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating, Push Pull fitted |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/12/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6580 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company Allocated to Hither Green (73C) Livery applied: Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
|
|
25/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
22/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
05/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
|
10/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 33119 |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (SL) |
|
|
26/10/1989 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 33119 |
|
|
08/04/1992 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|