Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 718 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14124 Week
» 67140 Month
» 186667 Year
» 3213520 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
6602 |
m/e |
08/1927 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
56xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
244 |
To Service |
During 08/1927 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 23/10/1964 |
Service Life |
37 yrs, 2 mths , 22 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1927 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 6602 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Barry (CV.BRY) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) |
|
|
14/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barry (88C) |
|
|
31/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barry (88C) |
|
|
19/04/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) |
|
|
17/05/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) |
|
|
08/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Duffryn Yard (87B) |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
17/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Duffryn Yard (87B) |
|
|
15/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neyland (87H) |
|
|
12/08/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D) |
|
|
28/12/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
23/10/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6602 |
|
|
02/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|