Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 727 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6127 Week
» 24179 Month
» 257099 Year
» 1922475 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 6606 m/e 09/1927

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 244
To Service During 09/1927
Withdrawal Fri 15/01/1965
Service Life 37 yrs, 4 mths , 15 dys
Information Was scheduled to be withdrawn on 6/1/64

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1965 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1927
85C   Hereford 8w/e 26/03/1955
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 13/08/1955
88A   Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 03/11/1956
88B   Radyr 4w/e 25/01/1964
     Withdrawn on 15/01/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC OXY Oxley 4w/e 12/07/1947
ALLOC SALOP Shrewsbury 4w/e 29/11/1947
ALLOC 85C Hereford 4w/e 26/02/1955
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 13/08/1955
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 03/11/1956
ALLOC 88B Radyr 4w/e 27/01/1964
WDN   5w/e 04/01/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/12/1962 Cardiff East Dock MPD There is no diesel locomotive whatever here and CED is now a full main line shed for the first time in its life ! This must be unique in railway history and the steam phase is expected to last two years as Canton is being demolished completely to make way for a diesel shed and main diesel depot for S. Wales. On 9th December, 1962, the following were on shed-1613, 2875/97, 3662, 3782/4, 3804/10, 4090, 4242/72/82, 5043/74/81/97, 5220/4/5/9, 5749, 6606/37/81, 6813/32/75/6, 6918/32/45/56/72/7/87/95, 7016, 7913, 8425/97, 9426/37, 9629, 92003/236/44/6. SLS/196302

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1927 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6606
Built at Swindon Works
   
26/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Hereford (85C)    
13/08/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
03/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
25/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88B)    
15/01/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 6606    
06/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev