Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 236 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3268 Week
» 21320 Month
» 254240 Year
» 1919616 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 6608 m/e 09/1927

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 244
To Service During 09/1927
Withdrawal Mon 15/06/1964
Service Life 36 yrs, 9 mths , 15 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1927
RHY   Rhymney m/e 31/03/1948
RYR   Radyr m/e 30/06/1948
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 27/07/1963
     Withdrawn on 15/06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC RHY Rhymney m/e 31/03/1948
ALLOC RYR Radyr m/e 30/06/1948
ALLOC 88DRHYM   4w/e 27/07/1963
WDN   w/e 15/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
23/04/1961 Wolverhampton Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: 1442/72, 1503, 2204, 3788, 3816, 4101/14, 4635, 4938, 5322, 5920, 6130, 6608/15, 7244/53, 7413/24/37, 7828, 9412/84/98, 9657, 9746, 82033. Works Yard: 3711/49, 4168/687, 6126, 6839, 8437, 9792, 73037, 75021, 92004. SLS/196106

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1927 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6608
Built at Swindon Works
   
31/03/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Rhymney (RHY)    
30/06/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (RYR)    
27/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
15/06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 6608    
12/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev