Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 791 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6191 Week
» 24243 Month
» 257163 Year
» 1922539 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 6612 m/e 10/1927

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 244
To Service During 10/1927
Withdrawal Fri 07/05/1965
Service Life 37 yrs, 7 mths , 7 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1965

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1927
CHYS   Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 21/05/1949
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 29/06/1963
     Withdrawn on 07/05/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CHYS Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 21/05/1949
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 05/09/1953
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 29/06/1963
TOSTORE   5w/e 12/04/1965
WDN   5w/e 16/05/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1927 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6612
Built at Swindon Works
   
21/05/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (CHYS)    
29/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
07/05/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 6612    
08/1965 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev