Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 771 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6171 Week
» 24223 Month
» 257143 Year
» 1922519 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 6613 m/e 10/1927

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 244
To Service During 10/1927
Withdrawal Fri 01/10/1965
Service Life 38 yrs , 1 dy

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1966

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1927
SED   Swansea East Dock 4w/e 03/12/1949
87A   Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 09/08/1958
87D   Swansea East Dock 4w/e 03/10/1959
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 09/03/1963
87F   Llanelly 4w/e 04/05/1963
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 27/07/1963
87F   Llanelly 4w/e 02/11/1963
     Withdrawn on 01/10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SED Swansea East Dock 4w/e 03/12/1949
ALLOC 87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 87D Swansea East Dock 4w/e 03/10/1959
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 09/03/1963
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 04/05/1963
ALLOC 88DRHYM   4w/e 27/07/1963
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 5w/e 02/11/1963
WDN   on 01/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1927 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6613
Built at Swindon Works
   
03/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (SED)    
09/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)    
03/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D)    
09/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
04/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
27/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
02/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
01/10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 6613    
02/1966 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev