Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 721 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6121 Week
» 24173 Month
» 257093 Year
» 1922469 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 6622 m/e 01/1928

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 244
To Service During 01/1928
Withdrawal Sat 26/12/1964
Service Life 36 yrs, 11 mths , 25 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1965

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1928
ABDR   Aberdare m/e 31/05/1948
SED   Swansea East Dock 4w/e 10/09/1949
OXF   Oxford 4w/e 08/10/1949
ABDR   Aberdare 4w/e 05/11/1949
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 3w/e 04/05/1964
     Withdrawn on 26/12/1964
86G   Pontypool Road 4w/e 27/12/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ABDR Aberdare m/e 31/05/1948
ALLOC SED Swansea East Dock 4w/e 10/09/1949
ALLOC OXF Oxford 4w/e 08/10/1949
ALLOC ABDR Aberdare 4w/e 05/11/1949
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 3w/e 04/05/1964
WDN   5w/e 04/01/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1928 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6622
Built at Swindon Works
   
31/05/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdare (ABDR)    
10/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (SED)    
08/10/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (OXF)    
05/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdare (ABDR)    
04/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
26/12/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 6622    
27/12/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G)    
04/1965 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev