Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 25 Today
» 1001 Yesterday
» 2100 Week
» 27461 Month
» 260381 Year
» 1925757 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 6624 m/e 01/1928

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 244
To Service During 01/1928
Withdrawal Mon 15/06/1964
Service Life 36 yrs, 5 mths , 15 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1928
84G   Shrewsbury 3w/e 19/05/1951
84D   Leamington w/e 06/09/1952
88A   Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 02/11/1957
     Withdrawn on 15/06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 19/05/1951
ALLOC 84D Leamington 4w/e 06/09/1952
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 02/11/1957
WDN   w/e 15/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1928 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6624
Built at Swindon Works
   
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
06/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
02/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
15/06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 6624    
10/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev