Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 193 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3225 Week
» 21277 Month
» 254197 Year
» 1919573 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 6627 m/e 02/1928

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 244
To Service During 02/1928
Withdrawal Fri 01/11/1963
Service Life 35 yrs, 9 mths , 1 dy

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1928
CH     m/e 30/06/1948
CHYS   Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 04/09/1948
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 17/10/1950
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 31/10/1950
81D   Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 03/10/1953
87H   Neyland 4w/e 03/10/1959
88J   Aberdare 4w/e 06/04/1963
     Withdrawn on 01/11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CH   m/e 30/06/1948
ALLOC CHYS Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 04/09/1948
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 17/10/1950
ALLOC 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 87H Neyland 4w/e 03/10/1959
ALLOC 88J Aberdare 4w/e 06/04/1963
WDN   on 01/11/1963
WDN   4w/e 30/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1928 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6627
Built at Swindon Works
   
30/06/1948 Allocation      
04/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (CHYS)    
17/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
31/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
03/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Neyland (87H)    
06/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdare (88J)    
01/11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 6627    
01/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev