Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 832 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6232 Week
» 24284 Month
» 257204 Year
» 1922580 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 6629 m/e 02/1928

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 244
To Service During 02/1928
Withdrawal Mon 15/10/1962
Service Life 34 yrs, 8 mths , 14 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1928
86H   Aberbeeg 4w/e 04/10/1958
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 20/05/1961
     Withdrawn on 15/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 86H Aberbeeg 4w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 26/05/1961
WDN   on 22/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/05/1958 Neath MPD In store are 4274, 6604/29, 7217. New diesel shunters here are D3361, D3432/3/4/5/6/7. These are allocated to Port Talbot but are maintained and refuelled at Neath. SLS/195808

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1928 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6629
Built at Swindon Works
   
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Aberbeeg (86H)    
20/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
15/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 6629    
08/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev