Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 832 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6232 Week
» 24284 Month
» 257204 Year
» 1922580 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 6658 m/e 09/1928

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 255
To Service During 09/1928
Withdrawal Wed 21/04/1965
Service Life 36 yrs, 7 mths , 21 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1965

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1928
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 06/10/1962
88D   Rhymney w/e 15/11/1964
86G   Pontypool Road 4w/e 27/12/1964
     Withdrawn on 21/04/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 88D Rhymney w/e 09/11/1964
ALLOC 86G Pontypool Road 5w/e 04/01/1965
WDN   5w/e 16/05/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1928 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6658
Built at Swindon Works
   
06/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
15/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Rhymney (88D)    
27/12/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G)    
21/04/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 6658    
09/1965 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev