Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2224 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15630 Week
» 68646 Month
» 188173 Year
» 3215026 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
6660 |
m/e |
09/1928 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
56xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
255 |
To Service |
During 09/1928 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 15/06/1964 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 9 mths , 15 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1964 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
RHY |
Rhymney |
4w/e |
03/11/1945 |
ALLOC |
CYS |
|
4w/e |
01/12/1945 |
ALLOC |
THT |
Treherbert |
4w/e |
07/08/1948 |
ALLOC |
CHYS |
Cardiff Cathays |
4w/e |
04/09/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
15/06/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1928 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 6660 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
03/11/1945 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
01/12/1945 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cardiff Cathays (CHYS) |
|
|
07/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Treherbert (THT) |
|
|
04/09/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (CHYS) |
|
|
15/06/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6660 |
|
|
12/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|