Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1468 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14874 Week
» 67890 Month
» 187417 Year
» 3214270 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
6661 |
m/e |
09/1928 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
56xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
255 |
To Service |
During 09/1928 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 16/06/1965 |
Service Life |
36 yrs, 9 mths , 16 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1965 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
AYN |
Abercynon |
4w/e |
16/07/1949 |
ALLOC |
86J |
Aberdare |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
ALLOC |
88D |
Merthyr Tydfil |
3w/e |
04/05/1964 |
ALLOC |
88B |
Radyr |
5w/e |
04/01/1965 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
13/06/1965 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/06/1965 |
WDN |
|
|
4w/e |
11/07/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
02/04/1948 |
Caerphilly Works |
On 2/4 the following locomotives were noted in the Erecting Shop:-Nos. 64, 72, 270, 320/21, 390, 3103/89, 3712, 4134, 4256/63/93/98, 4404, 5114, 5223, 5635/58/68/80, 6661 an 8796, while outside were observed Nos. 190, 3178, 4238/52, 5219, 5549 an 5649. |
SLS/194805 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1928 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 6661 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cardiff Cathays (CHYS) |
|
|
16/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Abercynon (CV.AYN) |
|
|
03/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdare (86J) |
|
|
04/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Radyr (88B) |
|
|
10/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Radyr (88B) |
|
|
16/06/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6661 |
|
|
10/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|