Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 1000 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 2074 Week
» 27435 Month
» 260355 Year
» 1925731 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 6663 m/e 09/1928

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 255
To Service During 09/1928
Withdrawal Mon 24/06/1963
Service Life 34 yrs, 9 mths , 24 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1963 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1928
PPRD   Pontypool Road 4w/e 04/09/1948
86H   Aberbeeg 8w/e 03/11/1951
86C   Cardiff Canton 8w/e 26/03/1955
86H   Aberbeeg 4w/e 10/09/1955
84F   Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 22/04/1961
84D   Leamington 4w/e 19/05/1962
     Withdrawn on 24/06/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC PPRD Pontypool Road 4w/e 04/09/1948
ALLOC 86H Aberbeeg 8w/e 03/11/1951
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 26/03/1955
ALLOC 86H Aberbeeg 4w/e 10/09/1955
ALLOC 84F Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 22/04/1961
ALLOC 84D Leamington 4w/e 19/05/1962
WDN   w/e 29/06/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
14/10/1962 Wolverhampton Stafford Road Works 1628/60, 2841/62, 3217, 3608/58, 3709/15/51/60/78, 4147, 4910/51, 5070, 5245, 5602, 6141, 6644/63/79, 6816, 6982, 7209, 8498, 9411/53, 9608/10/5/40/82. Ex-Works on shed: 9404/15; ex-Works on Oxley MPD; 4697, 7739. 'Kings' at Stafford Road minus numbers and nameplates: 6001/2/7/12/4/5/7/22. SLS/196211
30/12/1962 Western Regionboundary changes The following former W.R. engines were transferred to the L.M. Region when the depots to which they are allocated became the responsibility of that Region on 1.1.63. The official date of the transfer is December 30th, 1962: D3004/25-9/34-9, D3105-13/5/6/91-4, D3752/5/7, D3950-2/6-8/68-70/73-85/8/95-7, 1002/13/6/9/23/5, 1432/58, 1619/28/32/8/60/3/8, 2210/1/36/89 2845/51/6/66/75/88, 3208/9/17, 3601/5/7/19/25/31/58/60/73, 3709/44/9/70/6/8/82/8/9/92, 3802/6/9/13/5/7/21/5/8/9/31/45/6/9/52/5/7/65, 4105/11/4/20/5/33/40/7-9/53-5/8/65/7/8/71-3/5/6/8/9, 4602/17/45/6/8/65/83/7/96, 4923/46/54/98, 5022/6/31/63/89, 5101/53, 5192, 5606/40/58, 5927/42/83/90/1/4/5, 6129, 6314/64, 6403/24, 6604/9-11/5/8/25/31/2/44/6/63/7/8/71/4/8/9/83/92/4/8, 6803/11/23/7/8/30/1/3/9/42/5/51/3-5/7/8/61/2/4/6/70/1/9, 6903/4/6/7/11/5/6/7/22/5/6/9/30/3/4/52/64/71/6/9/80, 7001/12/4/9/24/6, 7207/18/36, 7414/8/24/6/31/43. 7800-3/6/7/9/10/2/8/9/21-4/7/8, 7905/8/12/5/8/29, 8109, 8464/98, 8718, 9435/63/70/98, 9608/10/3/4/24/30/6/9/46/57/69, 9724/33/53/68/74/82/93, 41201-4/9/31/2/40/1/85, 44835, 45143/5/90, 45283/98, 45406/22, 45572/7, 45660/99, 46401, 46503-27, 48330/47/54/69/402/4/10/2/5/7/8/24/30/6/50/9/60/71/4/5/8, 48724/38/9/68, 73025 6/34-6/90/5/7, 75000/2-4/6/9/20/1/3/4/6/7/9, 78000/2/3/7/8, 80070/8-80/96/8/100/l/2/4/5/31/2/5/6, 82000/3/5/6/9/20/1/31-4, 92001, 92212/3/5/27/8/34/47. SLS/196303

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1928 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6663
Built at Swindon Works
   
04/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Pontypool Road (PPRD)    
03/11/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Aberbeeg (86H)    
26/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
10/09/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Aberbeeg (86H)    
22/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F)    
19/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
24/06/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 6663    
11/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev