Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 992 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 2066 Week
» 27427 Month
» 260347 Year
» 1925723 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 6669 m/e 09/1928

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 255
To Service During 09/1928
Withdrawal Wed 05/12/1962
Service Life 34 yrs, 3 mths , 4 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1963 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1928
84E   Tyseley 4w/e 03/10/1953
85B   Gloucester Horton Road m/e 16/06/1956
85B   Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 12/06/1958
85D   Kidderminster 4w/e 14/06/1958
88B   Radyr 4w/e 08/09/1962
     Withdrawn on 05/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 85D Kidderminster 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 12/07/1958
ALLOC 88B Radyr 4w/e 08/09/1962
WDN   on 05/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/04/1948 Barry Works On 2/4 the following were observed in the Erecting Shop:-Nos. 344, 3707/14/75, 5608/19/60, 6669, 6754 an 9789, while out-side were:-Nos. 414, 1993, 5630, 6680, 6700 an 8748. SLS/194805

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1928 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6669
Built at Swindon Works
   
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (84E)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
12/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (85D)    
08/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88B)    
05/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 6669    
07/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev