Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 30 Today
» 1001 Yesterday
» 2105 Week
» 27466 Month
» 260386 Year
» 1925762 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 6679 m/e 09/1928

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 255
To Service During 09/1928
Withdrawal w/e Sat 25/09/1965
Service Life 37 yrs , 25 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1966 at Cohens (Kettering)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1928
STJ   Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 31/12/1949
86F   Tondu 4w/e 09/09/1950
86F   Tondu 4w/e 30/09/1950
85D   Kidderminster 8w/e 26/03/1955
2C   Stourbridge Junction w/e 01/02/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 25/09/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LDR Landore 4w/e 14/06/1947
ALLOC STJ Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 31/12/1949
ALLOC 86F Tondu 4w/e 09/09/1950
ALLOC 85D Kidderminster 4w/e 26/02/1955
ALLOC 2C Stourbridge Junction 3w/e 01/02/1964
WDN   w/e 25/09/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
14/10/1962 Wolverhampton Stafford Road Works 1628/60, 2841/62, 3217, 3608/58, 3709/15/51/60/78, 4147, 4910/51, 5070, 5245, 5602, 6141, 6644/63/79, 6816, 6982, 7209, 8498, 9411/53, 9608/10/5/40/82. Ex-Works on shed: 9404/15; ex-Works on Oxley MPD; 4697, 7739. 'Kings' at Stafford Road minus numbers and nameplates: 6001/2/7/12/4/5/7/22. SLS/196211
30/12/1962 Western Regionboundary changes The following former W.R. engines were transferred to the L.M. Region when the depots to which they are allocated became the responsibility of that Region on 1.1.63. The official date of the transfer is December 30th, 1962: D3004/25-9/34-9, D3105-13/5/6/91-4, D3752/5/7, D3950-2/6-8/68-70/73-85/8/95-7, 1002/13/6/9/23/5, 1432/58, 1619/28/32/8/60/3/8, 2210/1/36/89 2845/51/6/66/75/88, 3208/9/17, 3601/5/7/19/25/31/58/60/73, 3709/44/9/70/6/8/82/8/9/92, 3802/6/9/13/5/7/21/5/8/9/31/45/6/9/52/5/7/65, 4105/11/4/20/5/33/40/7-9/53-5/8/65/7/8/71-3/5/6/8/9, 4602/17/45/6/8/65/83/7/96, 4923/46/54/98, 5022/6/31/63/89, 5101/53, 5192, 5606/40/58, 5927/42/83/90/1/4/5, 6129, 6314/64, 6403/24, 6604/9-11/5/8/25/31/2/44/6/63/7/8/71/4/8/9/83/92/4/8, 6803/11/23/7/8/30/1/3/9/42/5/51/3-5/7/8/61/2/4/6/70/1/9, 6903/4/6/7/11/5/6/7/22/5/6/9/30/3/4/52/64/71/6/9/80, 7001/12/4/9/24/6, 7207/18/36, 7414/8/24/6/31/43. 7800-3/6/7/9/10/2/8/9/21-4/7/8, 7905/8/12/5/8/29, 8109, 8464/98, 8718, 9435/63/70/98, 9608/10/3/4/24/30/6/9/46/57/69, 9724/33/53/68/74/82/93, 41201-4/9/31/2/40/1/85, 44835, 45143/5/90, 45283/98, 45406/22, 45572/7, 45660/99, 46401, 46503-27, 48330/47/54/69/402/4/10/2/5/7/8/24/30/6/50/9/60/71/4/5/8, 48724/38/9/68, 73025 6/34-6/90/5/7, 75000/2-4/6/9/20/1/3/4/6/7/9, 78000/2/3/7/8, 80070/8-80/96/8/100/l/2/4/5/31/2/5/6, 82000/3/5/6/9/20/1/31-4, 92001, 92212/3/5/27/8/34/47. SLS/196303

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1928 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6679
Built at Swindon Works
   
31/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (STJ)    
09/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Tondu (86F)    
30/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Tondu (86F)    
26/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (85D)    
01/02/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (2C)    
25/09/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 6679    
03/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Kettering    

prev prev