Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 741 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6141 Week
» 24193 Month
» 257113 Year
» 1922489 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 6685 m/e 10/1928

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 255
To Service During 10/1928
Withdrawal Mon 28/09/1964
Service Life 35 yrs, 11 mths , 29 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1965 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1928
86H   Aberbeeg 4w/e 20/05/1950
86J   Aberdare 4w/e 19/04/1952
86J   Aberdare 3w/e 17/05/1952
86G   Pontypool Road 4w/e 14/06/1952
86G   Pontypool Road 6w/e 30/06/1952
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 29/06/1963
88E   Abercynon 6w/e 13/04/1964
     Withdrawn on 28/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 86H Aberbeeg 4w/e 20/05/1950
ALLOC 86J Aberdare 4w/e 19/04/1952
ALLOC 86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 29/06/1963
WDN   3w/e 05/10/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1928 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6685
Built at Swindon Works
   
20/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Aberbeeg (86H)    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdare (86J)    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdare (86J)    
14/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G)    
30/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G)    
29/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
13/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Abercynon (88E)    
28/09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 6685    
01/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev