Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 22 Today
» 1001 Yesterday
» 2097 Week
» 27458 Month
» 260378 Year
» 1925754 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 6690 m/e 10/1928

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 255
To Service During 10/1928
Withdrawal Thu 25/06/1964
Service Life 35 yrs, 8 mths , 26 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1928
85B   Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 01/11/1952
85D   Kidderminster 4w/e 21/04/1956
85B   Gloucester Horton Road m/e 16/06/1956
86C   Hereford 4w/e 31/12/1960
86G   Pontypool Road 4w/e 25/02/1961
88J   Aberdare 4w/e 19/05/1962
88B   Radyr 3w/e 04/05/1964
     Withdrawn on 25/06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 85D Kidderminster 4w/e 21/04/1956
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 85C Gloucester Barnwood 4w/e 31/12/1960
ALLOC 86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 25/02/1961
ALLOC 88J Aberdare 4w/e 19/05/1962
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 3w/e 04/05/1964
WDN   3w/e 20/07/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/01/1946 Swindon Works Locos entering works during January: 207/42/70, 1751/86, 2084, 2116, 2221/74, 2679, 2766, 2802/11/53/62/98, 2912/51, 3034, 3188, 3219/64, 3754, 3808/63, 4004/13/7/21, 4125, 4299, 4326, 4539/47/98, 4615, 4811/5/54, 4909/51/6/63/90, 5019/46/55/6/80, 5161, 5361, 5403, 5534/40/52/65, 5906/25/51/72/4/85, 6003/10/4/9/22/6, 6112, 6314/45/7/56, 6690, 6721, 6919/61/5, 7300/9, 7700/8, 7804, 8359, 8704/14/22/70, 9301, 9768/89/91, WD 71488, 75046. SLS/194604
18/05/1963 Wolverhampton (Stafford Road) Works (In Works) In Works1424, 3607(84G), 3763, 4132/55, 4278, 4646/80, 5263, 5938/75, 6690(88J), 6900/04/16/60/88, 7210, 9790/4. Waiting Works: L92 (ex-5786), 2896, 4255, 6648. Ex Works: 8400, 6134. SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1928 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6690
Built at Swindon Works
   
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
21/04/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (85D)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
31/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Hereford (86C)    
25/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G)    
19/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdare (88J)    
04/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88B)    
25/06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 6690    
12/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev