Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 209 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3241 Week
» 21293 Month
» 254213 Year
» 1919589 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 6691 m/e 10/1928

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 255
To Service During 10/1928
Withdrawal Fri 25/06/1965
Service Life 36 yrs, 8 mths , 26 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1965

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1928
DYD   Duffryn Yard 4w/e 13/08/1949
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 25/01/1964
87F   Llanelly 2w/e 11/04/1965
     Withdrawn on 25/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DYD Duffryn Yard 4w/e 13/08/1949
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 27/01/1964
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 5w/e 12/04/1965
WDN   on 25/06/1965
WDN   4w/e 11/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1928 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6691
Built at Swindon Works
   
13/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Duffryn Yard (DYD)    
25/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
11/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
25/06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 6691    
08/1965 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev