|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/07/1948 | Swindon Works | Locomotives entering Works during July included: Nos 1367, 1446, 2165, 2229/36, 2385, 2809/84/98, 3778, 3832/40/59, 4075/82, 4519/28/73/85, 4698, 4965/77/88, 5077, 5191, 5261, 5306, 5403, 5805, 5904/15/43, 6157, 6343/78, 6439, 6637, 6702, 6818/25/33/46/55, 7006, 7218, 7318, 7727, 7812, 8764/87, 9312/17, 9706/81; New work: Nos. 7014 BRD and 7015 SDN, both are painted G.W.R. green, as is No. 7016; the construction Of Nos. 4160-79 and 7430-39 is under way. During W/E 24/7 Nos. 5023, 6009 an 6910 were ex Works after having been in for the new British Railways' crest to be placed on the tenders, while during W/E 31/7 No. 5954 was ex general repair, having been painted black and lined out in red, cream and grey together with the new crest on the tender. During W/E 14/8 Nos. 7016 Chester Castle CDF and 7430 STB were completed; No. 8393 also entered Works during this week. It is understood that the next batch of 'Castle's' (Nos. 7018-27) has been cancelled. Works' pilots lately have been and are: Nos. 906, 1758, 1900 an 2751; The following locomotives came in for cutting-up during W/E 24/7: Nos. 2680, 3002/27, 4386, 5127 an 5349 |
SLS/194809 |
19/04/1958 | Cardiff East Dock | This shed is now completely dieselised and the last two locos. stabled there (6701/2) are stored pending 'sale.' | SLS/195805 |
31/08/1959 | Swansea Paxton St. MPD (Upper Bank) | The former LNW M.P.D. (Paxton St.) was closed w.e.f. 31st August; freight diagrams and 8F 2-8-0s have been transferred to Llanelly whilst passenger turns and the Fowler 2-6-4Ts transferred to Landore-the remaining shunting turns have been transferred to East Dock, which has taken over Upper Bank and Gurnos, the two ex-M.R. sheds. The present allocation at Upper Bank is 6700/2/14/38/63/6/7/8/73/4/8 and at Gurnos 6712/20/49/70/7. Llandovery is now sub to Llanelly. | SLS/195910 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1930 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 6702 Built at W.G. Bagnall, Works Number 2383 |
||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Cardiff East Dock (CED) | ||
14/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K) | ||
05/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D) | ||
18/07/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 6702 | ||
10/1960 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |