Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 267 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 4244 Week
» 15481 Month
» 248401 Year
» 1913777 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 6832 on 13/08/1937

Names Carried
Date From Name
13/08/1937 BROCKTON GRANGE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Grange
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 308
To Service Wed 13/08/1937
Withdrawal Wed 15/01/1964
Service Life 26 yrs, 5 mths , 2 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1964 at Cohens (Morriston)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 13/08/1937
SPM   St Philips Marsh 4w/e 31/12/1949
82C   Swindon 4w/e 01/11/1952
83E   St Blazey 4w/e 25/01/1958
83E   St Blazey 4w/e 04/10/1958
85D   Kidderminster 4w/e 01/11/1958
86C   Cardiff Canton 4w/e 28/11/1959
87F   Llanelly 4w/e 18/06/1960
87A   Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 04/11/1961
     Withdrawn on 15/01/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SPM St Philips Marsh 4w/e 31/12/1949
ALLOC 82C Swindon 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 83E St Blazey 4w/e 28/12/1957
ALLOC 83F Truro 4w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 85D Kidderminster 4w/e 01/11/1958
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 18/06/1960
ALLOC 87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 04/11/1961
WDN   4w/e 27/01/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/09/1961 Swindon Works ('A' Shop) 'A' Shop: D604, D816/7/21/3/5/43/70, D3431, D6306/8/21, 2866, 3852, 4003/79/81/7/9, D1000-11, D2379-83, 4117, 4707, 4904/26/33/43/66/79/92/8, 5018/38/74/92, 5208, 5380, 6021/6, 6808/16/25/32/4/40, 6948, 7018/28, 7219, 7825, 7905/21, 13115/84/6, 13259/65, 92215/26. Works Sidings: D820, D2086, D2143/4, D2378, D7000, 1009, 3670, 3839/59, 4100, 4917/8/83, 5000/78, 5951/98, 6014/6/9/27, 6964/87/96, 7200, 7756/75, 7909, 8721, 9400, 9749, 73027, 78008, 92241/5. Triangle: 1640, 5087, 5198, 5516, 5934/75, 8762/72/87, 9751, 13355. Dump: 1361/6, 1433, 1604, 5318, 6720, 7745/98, 8429, 8740/74/7/89, 9735/6/67. 'C' Shop: 4203, 5110/95. Outside Stock Shed: D806, D4025, D6303, 4948, 5815, 6900. Weigh House : Nil. Outside Weigh House: D801. Gasworks : Nil. SLS/196111
09/12/1962 Cardiff East Dock MPD There is no diesel locomotive whatever here and CED is now a full main line shed for the first time in its life ! This must be unique in railway history and the steam phase is expected to last two years as Canton is being demolished completely to make way for a diesel shed and main diesel depot for S. Wales. On 9th December, 1962, the following were on shed-1613, 2875/97, 3662, 3782/4, 3804/10, 4090, 4242/72/82, 5043/74/81/97, 5220/4/5/9, 5749, 6606/37/81, 6813/32/75/6, 6918/32/45/56/72/7/87/95, 7016, 7913, 8425/97, 9426/37, 9629, 92003/236/44/6. SLS/196302

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
13/08/1937 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6832, name: BROCKTON GRANGE
Built at Swindon Works
   
31/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (SPM)    
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
25/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to St Blazey (83E)    
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to St Blazey (83E)    
01/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (85D)    
28/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
04/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)    
15/01/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 6832    
05/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Morriston    

prev prev