31/07/1948 |
Swindon Works |
Locomotives entering Works during July included: Nos 1367, 1446, 2165, 2229/36, 2385, 2809/84/98, 3778, 3832/40/59, 4075/82, 4519/28/73/85, 4698, 4965/77/88, 5077, 5191, 5261, 5306, 5403, 5805, 5904/15/43, 6157, 6343/78, 6439, 6637, 6702, 6818/25/33/46/55, 7006, 7218, 7318, 7727, 7812, 8764/87, 9312/17, 9706/81; New work: Nos. 7014 BRD and 7015 SDN, both are painted G.W.R. green, as is No. 7016; the construction Of Nos. 4160-79 and 7430-39 is under way. During W/E 24/7 Nos. 5023, 6009 an 6910 were ex Works after having been in for the new British Railways' crest to be placed on the tenders, while during W/E 31/7 No. 5954 was ex general repair, having been painted black and lined out in red, cream and grey together with the new crest on the tender. During W/E 14/8 Nos. 7016 Chester Castle CDF and 7430 STB were completed; No. 8393 also entered Works during this week. It is understood that the next batch of 'Castle's' (Nos. 7018-27) has been cancelled. Works' pilots lately have been and are: Nos. 906, 1758, 1900 an 2751; The following locomotives came in for cutting-up during W/E 24/7: Nos. 2680, 3002/27, 4386, 5127 an 5349 |
SLS/194809 |
30/12/1962 |
Western Regionboundary changes |
The following former W.R. engines were transferred to the L.M. Region when the depots to which they are allocated became the responsibility of that Region on 1.1.63. The official date of the transfer is December 30th, 1962: D3004/25-9/34-9, D3105-13/5/6/91-4, D3752/5/7, D3950-2/6-8/68-70/73-85/8/95-7, 1002/13/6/9/23/5, 1432/58, 1619/28/32/8/60/3/8, 2210/1/36/89 2845/51/6/66/75/88, 3208/9/17, 3601/5/7/19/25/31/58/60/73, 3709/44/9/70/6/8/82/8/9/92, 3802/6/9/13/5/7/21/5/8/9/31/45/6/9/52/5/7/65, 4105/11/4/20/5/33/40/7-9/53-5/8/65/7/8/71-3/5/6/8/9, 4602/17/45/6/8/65/83/7/96, 4923/46/54/98, 5022/6/31/63/89, 5101/53, 5192, 5606/40/58, 5927/42/83/90/1/4/5, 6129, 6314/64, 6403/24, 6604/9-11/5/8/25/31/2/44/6/63/7/8/71/4/8/9/83/92/4/8, 6803/11/23/7/8/30/1/3/9/42/5/51/3-5/7/8/61/2/4/6/70/1/9, 6903/4/6/7/11/5/6/7/22/5/6/9/30/3/4/52/64/71/6/9/80, 7001/12/4/9/24/6, 7207/18/36, 7414/8/24/6/31/43. 7800-3/6/7/9/10/2/8/9/21-4/7/8, 7905/8/12/5/8/29, 8109, 8464/98, 8718, 9435/63/70/98, 9608/10/3/4/24/30/6/9/46/57/69, 9724/33/53/68/74/82/93, 41201-4/9/31/2/40/1/85, 44835, 45143/5/90, 45283/98, 45406/22, 45572/7, 45660/99, 46401, 46503-27, 48330/47/54/69/402/4/10/2/5/7/8/24/30/6/50/9/60/71/4/5/8, 48724/38/9/68, 73025 6/34-6/90/5/7, 75000/2-4/6/9/20/1/3/4/6/7/9, 78000/2/3/7/8, 80070/8-80/96/8/100/l/2/4/5/31/2/5/6, 82000/3/5/6/9/20/1/31-4, 92001, 92212/3/5/27/8/34/47. |
SLS/196303 |
24/03/1963 |
Wolverhampton Works (Works) |
Works: 1020 (82B), 1024 (82A), 2879 (82C), 4130/7, 4158 (84E), 4278, 4671, 5070 (81A), 5215, 5606, 6114 (86E), 6134, 6347 (87F), 6424, 6667, 6833/71, 6911, 7000 (85B), 8446 (88C), 9619, 9782. Yard: 1424 (85B), 6900 (82C), 6910. |
SLS/196304 |
15/05/1963 |
Derby Works (Works) |
Erecting Shop-No. 1 bay: 41535, 42098 cut up, 44466, 44521, 47003, 73021/86, 75064, D102, D2236, D2396, D2509, D2911, D3023, ED6/7; Erecting Shop-No. 2 bay: D63, D88, D110, D5019, D5074; Erecting Shop-No. 3 bay: D5198, D5210-23new. Diesel Erecting Shop: D43, D85, D89, D95, D103/9/26/8, D140/9, D152/4, D5091. Test House: D71, D83, D124, D5002/86, D5145, D5205/6/7. Finishing Shop: D94, D119, D5208/9. Paint Shop: D5203/4. Yard (by Paint Shop): 42117 cut up, D4, D6, D7, D77, D127, D5010/93, D5200. Foundry Siding: 42100, 42429/72, 42500, 43599, 73001/67, 75012. Stone Pit: 42333, 42636 (badly damaged after falling into t.t. pit at Derby, 24th April), 44252, 47460. Stored Outside Offices: 10000/201/2/3. Waiting Works: 73032. |
SLS/196304 |