Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 26 Today
» 1001 Yesterday
» 2101 Week
» 27462 Month
» 260382 Year
» 1925758 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 6835 on 01/09/1937

Names Carried
Date From Name
01/09/1937 EASTHAM GRANGE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Grange
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 308
To Service Fri 01/09/1937
Withdrawal Fri 24/05/1963
Service Life 25 yrs, 8 mths , 23 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 01/09/1937
84D   Leamington 4w/e 21/04/1951
84D   Leamington 3w/e 19/05/1951
84C   Banbury 4w/e 16/06/1951
84C   Banbury 6w/e 30/06/1951
84K   Chester West 2w/e 12/07/1952
82B   St Philips Marsh 4w/e 17/07/1954
83G   Penzance 4w/e 27/01/1962
84B   Oxley 4w/e 21/04/1962
82B   St Philips Marsh 4w/e 19/05/1962
     Withdrawn on 24/05/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 84D Leamington 4w/e 21/04/1951
ALLOC 84C Banbury 4w/e 16/06/1951
ALLOC 84K Chester West 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 17/07/1954
ALLOC 83G Penzance 4w/e 27/01/1962
ALLOC 84B Oxley 4w/e 21/04/1962
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 19/05/1962
WDN   4w/e 01/06/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/01/1943 Sheds noted 1/43 2870 ABDR; 8710, 9797 ABG; 3821, 4909, 6835/9, 7800/11 (BAN); 2220, 5025/76, 5564, 6014/7/24, 7802 (BL); 6863 BL/SPM; 4094, 5049, 5970, 6353 (CDF); 5951, 7815 (GLO); 3446, 5060, 6000, 6911 (LA); 6857 (LDR); 5028 (NA); 2636 (NPT); 9317 (OXF); 8302 (OXY); 2881, 4037/89, 4900/98, 5027, 5922/41/96(); 6155, 6902/20, 9306/8 (PDN); 5975 (PPR); 9315 (RDG); 4956, 5566, 6387, 7253 (SDN); 5994 (SLP); 2838/62, 6873 (STJ); 4013/53, 5031, 5957, 6321 (SRD); 5346 (TYS); 5954/99 (TN); 4045, 5406 (WES); 5983, 6877, 6921 (WOS). SLS/194302
30/11/1948 Swindon Works New Work November: Nos. 6761 DYD (3/11), 6762 (4/11), 6763 (10/11), 6764 (12/11), 6765 (26/11); 4169 (15/11); 6991 Acton Burnell Hall WES (22/11), 6992 Arborfield Hall (26/11); Nos. 4168 an 6760 PILL were both completed on 29/10. Locomotives entering Works 28/10/48 to 26/11/48: These included Nos. 184 (condemned), 1013/27, 1331, 1435, 1538 (condemned - at present being used as Works pilot), 1749 (condemned), *1867 (condemned), *2010, *2121, *2187, 2249, *2706, *2717 (both condemned), 2819/71/74/88/96, 2906/32/40/43/53, 3169/86, 3624/77, 3733, 3806/41/64, 3951, 4015/18/25/60/81/83/92/93, 4123, 4287, 4508/53/84, 4665/91, 4900/60, 5031/32/49/67, 5121 (condemned), 5128/77, 5345, 5406/11, 5537/44/48, 5689, 5744/72/81/94, 5801, 5926/67/89, 6021, 6146, 6382/88, 6407, 6715, 6835/43/52, 6915/35/40/47/50/59/61, 7760, 7808, 8751, **9019 (condemned), 9310, 9754, 'Austerity' 77380. *Open cab. **Fitted small 2,000 gallon tender (No. 1128 of 4/96). Nos. 6991/92 came out painted black and fully lined, While Nos. 4168/69, 6760/65 are black and unlined. The following have been painted black and fully lined:-Nos. 4966/96, 5967/92, 6922/40/50 while Nos. 1362, 2194, 2252, 2840, 3685/96, 3811, 4290, 5214, 5384, 5563, 7234, 7716/64, 8768/77, 9310 an 9711 are painted black, but not lined. Nos. 3720 an 7702 have 'G.W.R.' on the tank sides and are fitted with smokebox numberplates. No. 6009 has been fitted with a new standard cast iron smokebox num-berplate, in place of the former smaller brass one, all locomotives leaving Works are now fitted with smokebox numberplates. Locomotives noted with top feed boilers:-Nos. 3624/85/96, 5772/81, 5801, 7702/16/64, 8710/68/77, 9745. SLS/194901
18/08/1963 Swindon Works (Yard) Triangle: 1432, 6437, 5679, 8444/86/91/94/96, 8766, 9401/79/83, 9715, D3103. Yard: 1621, 3668, 3711, 3826, 4082, 4175, 4265/98, 5645, 5933, 6011/25/26, 6159, 6815/19/28/35, 6931/32/61/78, 7909, 8738, 9412/40. 'A' Shop: D1023-26 (New in various stages of construction), D603, D801/4/40/61/2, D1004/9/16/9/50/63, D6305, D7075, 3605, 3738, 3850, 4115/57/68, 5971, 6000/18, 6129/65, 6809/15/37/68, 6937/44/78/94, 7902/27, 8403, 9662, 92246, Birmingham Pullman, uW60096. Top end of 'A' Shop: 15100/1/3, D3509/94/95, D3195, D3600, and N.C.B. 0-6-2 T. 67 (ex T.V.R.). Dismantling Shed: 5644, 5945. Dump: 3795, 4074, 5101/92, 5201, 5912/31, 7;412, 8783/91, 9713. Weigh House: D604, D808, 3823. On shed ex-Works: 9607, 9666. In store on shed: 1019, 2250, 2890, 3780, 3842, 4079, 4631, 4909, 4948, 5017, 5357, 5525/70, 5815, 5943, 9604 an W21. SLS/196309
27/10/1963 Swindon Works ('A' Shop) Triangle: 3653, 4507, 4690, 9645. Yard: D829/50/69, D1056, 3652/68, 3766/9, 4082, 4113/76, 5093, 6000/11/25/26, 6763 6819/58/61, 6922/23/61, 7803/08, 8738, 9412/40, 9633, 9700/99. 'A' Shop: D833/4/45/61, D1000/1/7/25/6/8/36/40/54/63/7, D3102, D3510/1/2/9, D3599/604/809, D7039, 4121/50/61, 6116, 6820/35, 6864/66/72/6, 6947/59/80, 7922, 9605, 9673. Dump: 1471, 1608, 4134, 4629/51, 5201, 5645, 5787, 6416, 6609/31/9/74, 8491, 8791, 9401, 9636, 9764. SLS/196312

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/09/1937 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6835, name: EASTHAM GRANGE
Built at Swindon Works
   
21/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
16/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (84C)    
30/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (84C)    
12/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Chester West (84K)    
17/07/1954 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
27/01/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Penzance (83G)    
21/04/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Oxley (84B)    
19/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
24/05/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 6835    
10/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev