Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2649 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16055 Week
» 69071 Month
» 188598 Year
» 3215451 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
6942 |
on |
22/08/1942 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
Hall |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
340 |
To Service |
Mon 22/08/1942 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 14/12/1964 |
Service Life |
22 yrs, 3 mths , 22 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/03/1948 |
Swindon Works |
Locomotives entering Works during March included: Nos. 1006/16, 1434, 1861, 2943/44, 3015, 3803/53/60, 4012/16/23/26/30/35/77/90/94, 4803, 4941/98, 5006/09/25/59/68/80/97, 5339/50/78, 5901/07/48/83, 6011/13/19/22, 6318/20/22/65, 6903/20/23/42/51, 7001, 9089 an 9302. New work: Nos. 6986-89 and 0-6-0 Diesel-electric No. 15101, the latter with cast brass number plates and 'British Railways' on the sides; also numbers in 3' letters in the centre of the buffer beams. W.D. Nos. 77060/145/280/335, 79244 (all ex repair in Belgium) and 78624 arrived in the Works on 23/3 from Marston sidings. W.D. Nos. 77027 an 77165 are ex Works with G.W. type top feed and Wakefield lubricator. Works' pilots recently have been and are Nos. 198, 250, 410, 1713 an 2781; 905 ceased to work on these duties W/E 13/3 and has gone for scrapping. No. 1358 was in the Works W/E 13/3 for scrapping, while No. 3004 was cut up in the same week. No. 6022 LA went on the test plant on 18/3 for several days and is now being prepared to go to the L.N.E.R. Engines ex Works are now emerging without the prefix W. |
SLS/194805 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/08/1942 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 6942 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Oxley (OXY) |
|
|
04/1948 |
Naming |
Named 'ESHTON HALL' |
|
|
29/01/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (TYS) |
|
|
04/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stafford Road (84A) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stafford Road (84A) |
|
|
02/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxley (84B) |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxley (84B) |
|
|
10/09/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) |
|
|
29/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Blazey (83E) |
|
|
20/04/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester West (84K) |
|
|
06/09/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) |
|
|
01/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
27/07/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
28/12/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G) |
|
|
22/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
14/12/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6942 |
|
|
04/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|