Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 161 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17964 Week
» 70980 Month
» 190507 Year
» 3217360 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
6963 |
on |
26/04/1944 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Hawksworth |
Class |
Modified Hall |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
350 |
To Service |
Wed 26/04/1944 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 21/07/1965 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 2 mths , 25 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
16/11/1946 |
Exeter MPD |
On 16/11, the following were observed on Exeter shed: 3018, 3395, 3451, 4954, 5051, 5321, 6421, 6957 and 6963; whilst L.M.S. 8.F 8409 and 8421 were on passing freight trains. 1449 and 1468 were working the Heathfield branch and 3335 and 6385 were station pilots. The 11.25 a.m. (G.W.) stopping train to Plymouth was worked by S.R. 21C118 |
SLS/194701 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/04/1944 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 6963 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
09/1944 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
01/12/1945 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
01/1947 |
Naming |
Named 'THROWLEY HALL' |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Shrewsbury (SALOP) |
|
|
01/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Banbury (84C) |
|
|
31/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Banbury (84C) |
|
|
19/04/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxley (84B) |
|
|
17/05/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxley (84B) |
|
|
12/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester West (84K) |
|
|
08/06/1957 |
Report |
Report: On June 8 the 4.10 p.m. Paddington-Birkenhead left London with “°King" No. 6020 as pilot to "Hall" No. 6963. (Trains Illustrated - August, 1957) |
|
|
06/09/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) |
|
|
31/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
28/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) |
|
|
31/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
04/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D) |
|
|
27/12/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D) |
|
|
10/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Didcot (81E) |
|
|
11/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxford (81F) |
|
|
21/07/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6963 |
|
|
10/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|