30/04/1951 |
\"Britannia\" Class |
70000 an 70001 have settled down on regular duties now; the former appears on the 'Norfolkman' most days and 70001 regularly works the 'Hook Continental.' The other two, which have been at Stratford for some time, seem to alternate on many of the principal turns. 70006 was first at Liverpool Street on 1st May, having brought the 7.35 from Yarmouth, Vauxhall, arriving, right time, at 12.36. 70004 is, of course, on the South Bank and it is understood that 70005 is at present at Rugby Testing Plant. |
SLS/195106 |
30/06/1951 |
Britannias & B. of B.\'s |
Apart from 70004/9/14 the E.R. Allocation of Class '7' Pacifics was completed during Date: w/e 30th June, 70005 having returned from Rugby and been observed working 'The Norfolkrnan' on 27th June. On the whole these engines have made the most of their opportunities of really showing their paces on the new services which commenced with the Summer Timetable on 2nd July. The new timings, the results of imaginative and enterprising timetable work provide, among many improvements, four trains running daily between Liverpool St. and Norwich in 130 minutes. The Southern Region light 'Pacifics' have appeared on most of the main line expresses since their arrival but their activities have been somewhat circumscribed by the absence of water scoops which, on the Norwich run entails an extended stop for water at Ipswich. Despite this, 34065 worked the 8.30 a.m. 'flyer' on 20th July. 34039 also made a rare appearance on the Up 'Hook Continental' on 30th July. |
SLS/195109 |
06/10/1951 |
Southern Notes |
The solitary saddle tank, S.R. 1685 has also gone. This was converted from' 'C'. 0-6-0 No. 685 in 1917, and was for a long while stationed at Bricklayers' Arms, until it was moved to East Kent, and, temporarily, to St. Leonards, where water cranes would not reach high enough to fill her tanks. The once-famous 'I3' Marsh 4-4-2 express tanks are almost extinct; the only one left in stock being No. 32091. No. 32086, although officially withdrawn on 6th October, was still running on the 17th. 'T9' Drummond 4-4-0, No. 30718 was recently on a milk train at East Croydon, a duty generally worked by an 'H' tank. Officially described as for L.M.R. stock, the 2-6-6-2 diesel-electric express locomotive, No. 10202, recently completed and tried out at Ashford, commenced a spell of Waterloo-Exeter ordinary express running on 15th October. The 10 standard 2-6-4Ts, numbered 80010-19 have been completed at Brighton, and most of them are working from Tunbridge Wells, which, it is understood, will be the allocation of all. Three of the L.M.S. type have gone from Tunbridge Wells to Exeter S.R. area and others have been reallocated on the Eastern Section. New light 2-6-2Ts of the Crewe-built series, numbered 41290 upwards, have arrived on the Central Section and have been seen on empty carriage duties at London termini. Some further standard 2-6-4Ts, now building. at Brighton, will eventually, be fitted with water scoops, and some with tablet-catchers, for the L.M.R. or Scottish Regions. No. 80020/1, just out, will have catchers fitted in Scotland. Class 7 standard 4-6,2, 70004, which had taken up regular working of the 'Golden Arrow' between Victoria and Dover, after exhibition at the Festival of Britain, sustained a broken connecting rod while hauling the up 'Golden Arrow' on Sunday, 21st October, and came to stop at Headcorn with motion seized. William Shakespeare was immovable until fitters arrived, so that delay was considerable: she is now at Ashford waiting parts from Crewe. |
SLS/195112 |
19/03/1952 |
Standard Class 7\'s |
70014 Iron Duke is back on Eastern Section Continental workings. To date all has been well except when a Schools had to give assistance from Tonbridge. 70004 William Shakespeare is also back. |
SLS/195206 |
07/01/1961 |
Trafford Park MPD |
70004/14/5/7/21/32/3/42 have been transferred to Willesden and replaced by 45540, 46106/22/37/41/3/53/8. On Saturday, 7th January, 70004 worked the 12-34 p.m. Watford-New St. Birmingham and returned on the 7-37 p.m. New St.-Euston. |
SLS/196102 |
04/06/1961 |
Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) |
Paint Shop: D105-8/10, 45139, 45403, 45584, 45626, 46146, 78021. Outside Paint Shop: D97, D109, 41222/66, 42286, 44910, 45397, 45694, 46127, 46246, 49395, 92020. Works Sidings: 41269, 42441/78, 42604, 44685, 44714/66, 44832, 44907, 45021, 45208/34/96, 45438, 45535/91, 45641, 46125/8, 46404, 48525, 90163, 90388, 90595, 92033/74. Erecting Shop: D114-9, 41218/42, 42226/96, 42431, 42559, 42625/64, 44682, 44715, 44875/92, 44946, 45056/70/80, 45107/9, 45222/38/42, 45310/27/42, 45415/26/37, 45510/23/55/64, 45703/17, 46117, 46222/9/32/8, 46429, 46509, 48258, 48305/35/93, 48409/36, 48549/53/6, 48760, 49447, 70004, 78061, 90251/76, 90557, 90685, 90724, 92087, 92132. Outside Erecting Shop: 42227, 44874, 45686, 45734, 46116/70. New Erecting Shop: D111-3/20-4, D222. Scrap Yard: 40002, 40658/91, 43225, 43459, 47374, 52240/60, 52464, 52526 all intact, with 40502 being cut-up. Works Shunters: 12022, 44373/4, 47592, 47648, 51441/4/6, 52093, 52312. |
SLS/196107 |
25/06/1961 |
Crewe Works (Outside Paint Shop) |
Paint Shop: D112/3, 41326, 44682, 48549, 49395, 90537, Outside Paint Shop: D109-11, 10203, 45080, 45203, 45426, 46232, 46404, 48553, 48707, 70004. Works Sidings: 41229, 42118, 45104, 45218, 45438, 45516/29, 46155, 48287, 48648/97, 48761, 90163, 90327/81/8, 90685, 92030/77. Erecting Shop: D5016, 42136/58, 42234, 42452/78, 42589, 42651, 44658/85, 44714/28/48, 44857, 44949/87, 45021, 45107/89, 45238/47/8/9/86/96, 45367/70/94, 45410/35/45, 45588, 45641/58/61, 46102/42/7, 46243, 46441, 46502, 48154, 48264, 48375, 48446, 48724/67, 49048, 90125, 90264/66, 90338, 90408, 90528, 90646, 92074. Outside Erecting Shop: D78, D108, 42226, 44888, 44946, 45254, 45615, 46131, 46238, 46484, 92032. New Erecting Shop: D75, D114-26. Scrap Yard: 40050, 40126/55/71, 47571, 47605 all intact. |
SLS/196108 |
14/08/1963 |
Crewe Works (Yard) |
Erecting Shop: D1030-34, D1073, D1550-58 UC (in various stages), D202/24/32/36/87, D316, 46230, 46442, 44812/96, 44936, 45070/94, 45310/40, 45421/31, 48121/64, 48766, 70018/50, 73166, 90384, 92014/56/83/105/113/133/154/167/173/191. Outside Erecting Shop: 44674, 45414/51, 48409, 82038, 12134/240. Stripped down in Yard: 92084/132/151/162. Dismantling Shed: 49448, 64791, 64907, 90095. On Scrap Road: 63808/17/65. Yard: D215/98, D338/344, 42151, 44826/909/81, 45218/305/398, 48035/133/296/751/770, 70004/21, 73025, 75000, 84012, 92100. Electric and Diesel Shop: 26057, 27002/4. Paint Shop: D1069/70/71/72, 45295, 45573, 49395, 26010, 1439 and Lion. Outside Paint Shop: D227/90, D335/79, D8007/21, 45283, 48502/618/709, 70020, 92020/40/86/123/192. On 21st July, Royal Scot 46151 was in the dismantling shed being broken-up, and 46152 was in the erecting shop having a casual. |
SLS/196309 |
01/04/1964 |
Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) |
Erecting Shop: New Construction, D1583-98 (in various stages), D205/27/46/70/86, D303/7/28/30/83/87, D5717, D6775/84, D6863/78, D8002/6/7/23/50, 44918, 45382/408/577/626, 46443, 48169/225/69/474/528/615/37/95/729/42, 70000/4/10, 82009 92121/22. Outside Erecting Shop: D300, D5719, D6783/9, 45426, 48154/436/742/50, 78041, 92137. Electric Shop: D204, D6843, E3007, 26000/9, 27003. Yard: 42055/81, 42410/583/699, 43957, 44405, 44676/873/917/87, 45217/372/445, 45569/658, 46436/41/524, 48073/258/332/424/613/749, 84021/3/4, 92002/62/156/73. Inside and Around Paint Shop: New Construction, D1563, D1567-82. Weigh Shed: 48753. Outside Paint Shop: D201/23/339, 26006, 45069/75, 48185/436/734, 92082/163. Inside Paint Shop: D259, D311, D1034, 49395, 92053 and L.M.S. 6229 Duchess of Hamilton, painted in L.M.S livery (for a Butlins Camp). |
SLS/196405 |
29/10/1967 |
Crewe South MPD |
45285/7, 48018, 48729, 92047, 70004/24/31/45. Stored-48402, LNER 4498. Withdrawn-D2519, 15000/2, 42647, 43001/3/7/21, 44680/1/4, 44765, 44805/8/12/4/21/32/3/43/60/5, 44944, 45006/21/42/52/60/89,45186, 45243/70/8/97/8, 45308, 45405/94, 46520, 48220, 48364, 48474, 48521/2/48, 48603/43, 48725/67, 75029, 76051, 92100. |
SLS/196712 |