27/03/1953 |
Merchant Navy problems - \"foreign\" locos drafted in |
The temporary withdrawal of the 'Merchant Navy' engines for special examination, has led to the drafting of a number of strangers from other regions. Several V2 have been seen, among them 60829 an 60893; also the following Bl, Nos. 61133, 61192, 61354. From the L.M.R. come 45061, 45130 (latter seen passing Basingstoke on 30th May), and from W.R. at least, 70017 an 70024. There are certainly others, but at the time of going to press, no official notes have given details. |
SLS/195306 |
19/02/1961 |
Swindon Works ('A' Shop) |
Gas Works Sidings: 1502/9, 1603/52, 3638/49, 3704, 4203, 5103/10/76, 6752/3/61/76, 7740, 8406/76, 9400/14/47/9/58, 9795. Stock Shed Yard: 1361/4, 1410/33/54, 4644, 5920, 6158, 6336, 7410/3, 7761, 8473. Triangle: 1366, 2227, 3799, 4170, 4287, 4587, 4978, 5207, 5519, 6425, 6864, 6979, 7704/76, 8457. Works Yard: 1014/25, 1625/9, 2207, 2516, 4099, 4701, 4902/15/81/5, 5025, 6003, 6131, 6945/53/61, 7000/20, 7325, 7775/94, 7902, 8454, 9481, 9701/49, 18000, 78000/8, L.T.E. L91. 'A' Shop: D604, D800/9/11/8/20/66-70, D1000-5, D2187-92, D3000/27, D3182, D6301/3/5, 7, 1017, 3806, 4073/4, 4128/31/48, 4274, 4574, 4919/24/7/30/5/54, 5008/19/27/9/32/68/71, 5900/23/72/85/6, 6023/7/9, 6122/44/7, 6368, 6822/51, 6917/29/36/51, 7033, 7908, 15100/4, 70024, 82032/9, 92232. Dump: 1601/2/10/20/59, 2813/9/32, 4550/9/94, 5331/91, 5510/4, 6333/52, 6775, 8419, 9462. 'C' Shop: 1616/44, 2846, 4281, 6382. |
SLS/196104 |
10/09/1961 |
Britannia class 7s |
The remaining 12 B.R. Britannias on the W.R. (70016/8/9/20/2-9) (from 88A, Cardiff Canton) were transferred to the L.M.R. on 10th September. In the small hours of that morning 6 went light-engine to Shrewsbury, one worked a freight to Shrewsbury and another the 7-10 a.m. to London. Two more (70019/26) were at that time stopped at Worcester and Swindon and will presumably go direct from there. 70023/4 were retained in service against non-arrival of replacements and finally worked the 8-55 a.m. passenger and 12-55 a.m. freight to Shrewsbury respectively on 13th September. In replacement, Canton has been allocated 4083, 5020/53/73/91/6, 6010/24 an 7016 together with seven Halls. The two Kings are to strengthen the power on the Shrewsbury road. There are indications that this is only a part of re-arrangements involving redistribution of steam power from the west of England as 5058 (ex Laira) was observed in transit to Gloucester the same weekend. 70025/7/8 subsequently arrived at Bescot and are working goods and mineral trains. 70026 arrived at Aston. |
SLS/196110 |
31/10/1962 |
Rugby MPD |
Jubilees 45599, 45704/22/33 were put to store in the open in Oct. and replaced by 70017/22/3/4. 70006(31B) replaced a Rugby Sulzer d/e on 2nd Nov. on the Lowestoft-Birmingham train. |
SLS/196212 |
06/03/1963 |
Rugby MPD |
Following complaints from drivers, Britannias 70017/22/3/4 have been transferred to Aston in exchange for 45065, 45231, 45418/48. During the bad weather in the winter they were in store and in their place 45599 an 45704 were taken out of store for a short time. |
SLS/196304 |
01/04/1963 |
Swadlincote closure |
The closure of the Swadlincote loop to passenger trains applies only to the Woodville Junc.-Woodville section, which may be closed completely. As there are no run-round facilities at Woodville, excursions are unlikely to use other than the Swadlincote Junc.-Swadlincote section. |
SLS/196304 |
03/05/1964 |
Crewe Works (Works Yard) |
Awaiting Works at Scrap Yard: 44835, 45064, 48053, 48354, 48717, 70022. Awaiting Scrap at Scrap Yard: 42897, 42922, 48140, 48209. Diesel Erecting Shop: D277, D342, D349, D6843, 26005, 26034, 26048. Outside Diesel Erecting Shop: D205, D210, D219, D241, D255, D274, D1582 painted, D1583, D1585 undercoat, D1609, D1610, D1611 shell only, 26047, 27006, 46457. Outside Erecting Shop: D254, 42081, 42410, 45080, 45112, 45217, 48528, 92156, 92177. Erecting Shop: D226, D248, D256, D315, D335, D336, D340, D1591 undercoat, D1592 nearly complete, D1593, D1594, D1595, D1596 motors mounted, D1597, D1598, D1599, D1600, D1601, D1602, D1603, D1604, D1605, D1606, D1607, D1608 shell only, D5719, D6789, D6794, D6884, D8050, 42055, 42085, 42394, 44665, 44873, 44884, 45132, 45147, 45182, 45336, 45354, 45415, 45647, 46436, 48211, 48258, 48313, 48424, 48746, 48749, 48759, 92026, 92030, 92085. Works Yard: 42583, 44662, 44872, 44898, 45000, 45271, 45558, 48070, 48171, 48371, 48462, 48538, 48602, 48613, 48684, 70010, 70024, 70049, 78002, 78007, 78017, 92062, 92102, 92126, 92154, 92166, 92227. Outside Paint Shop: D298, D1584 undercoat, D5717, D6775, D6863, D8002, D8027, 48742. Paint Shop: D1578 painted, D1579, D1580, D1581, D1586, D1587, D1588, D1589, D1590 undercoat, 26028. |
SLS/196406 |
29/10/1967 |
Crewe South MPD |
45285/7, 48018, 48729, 92047, 70004/24/31/45. Stored-48402, LNER 4498. Withdrawn-D2519, 15000/2, 42647, 43001/3/7/21, 44680/1/4, 44765, 44805/8/12/4/21/32/3/43/60/5, 44944, 45006/21/42/52/60/89,45186, 45243/70/8/97/8, 45308, 45405/94, 46520, 48220, 48364, 48474, 48521/2/48, 48603/43, 48725/67, 75029, 76051, 92100. |
SLS/196712 |