|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
10/09/1961 | Britannia class 7s | The remaining 12 B.R. Britannias on the W.R. (70016/8/9/20/2-9) (from 88A, Cardiff Canton) were transferred to the L.M.R. on 10th September. In the small hours of that morning 6 went light-engine to Shrewsbury, one worked a freight to Shrewsbury and another the 7-10 a.m. to London. Two more (70019/26) were at that time stopped at Worcester and Swindon and will presumably go direct from there. 70023/4 were retained in service against non-arrival of replacements and finally worked the 8-55 a.m. passenger and 12-55 a.m. freight to Shrewsbury respectively on 13th September. In replacement, Canton has been allocated 4083, 5020/53/73/91/6, 6010/24 an 7016 together with seven Halls. The two Kings are to strengthen the power on the Shrewsbury road. There are indications that this is only a part of re-arrangements involving redistribution of steam power from the west of England as 5058 (ex Laira) was observed in transit to Gloucester the same weekend. 70025/7/8 subsequently arrived at Bescot and are working goods and mineral trains. 70026 arrived at Aston. | SLS/196110 |
31/12/1961 | Crewe Works (Works Sidings) | Paint Shop: D9, D50, D134-7, 42600/9, 44755/81, 44942, 45092, 45680, 46224, 49395, 78035 and the usual preserved locos. Out-side Paint Shop: D5031, 42117, 42639, 45421. 45690, 48205, 70043/9. Erecting Shop: D51-60, D235, D5137, 41200, 42234/67/83/92, 42437, 42606, 44680/4, 44739/49/53, 44806, 44985, 45034, 45147, 45233, 45369/83/95, 45568/9, 45625/39/60/84, 46166, 46230/44, 46485, 48080, 48111/34, 48304, 48429/53, 48518, 48601/74, 48733, 49141. 70031, 78036, 84001, 92025/93, 92167. Outside Erecting Shop: 42073, 45283, 45560, 46152, 70022, 90702. New Erecting Shop: D1/5, D229/31/6, D328, D5073, D5136. Works Sidings: 41262, 42460, 44686, 44756, 45140/5, 45215/27/79/98, 45645. 46109/21/7/50, 46236, 48172, 48416, 48649, 48930/50. 49246, 49313, 70026/42, 78037, 90147, 90413, 92018, 92159. Scrap Road: 47467, 47420, 47570 being cut up, 40074, 42220. 44088, 44249, 45544, 47755, 47405. 50850 intact. Works Shunters: D3584, 43957, 44374, 47618/61/77, 51412/46, 52093. | SLS/196202 |
14/11/1965 | Crewe Works (Main Erecting shop) | Main Erecting shop: 42249, 44690, 44761, 45021/150, 48176/214/53/78/92, 48544, 48775, 70010/25/6/9/53. 92012, D181, D208/15/21/89/97, D311/32/82/98, D1518/32/42/50/7/60/7/84/97, D1980-9. Electric shop: E3014/45/7/51/86, 26002/8, 27002. New Diesel Repair Shop: D153, D1534/70/82, D1683, D1717/76, D1843/60. Test Area: D1536/72, D1976, D5705/14. Traverser Area: 45421, 48545, 70013, 26027, E3060, D376/7, D1516/23/8/68, D1646/89, D1715, D1849, D5244, D5716. Side of Works: 48744, 70047, 92117/228, E3052. Paint shop: D1974/5/7/8/9, 46235, D305/58, E3054/97, D5709. Outside paint shop: 44809, 48033, 92063 re-painted, D347, D1541, D1634, D1770, D5710. | SLS/196512 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/10/1952 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 70026, name: POLAR STAR Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) |
||
01/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) | ||
10/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aston (21D) | ||
06/04/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Holyhead (6J) | ||
29/05/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) | ||
14/01/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 70026 | ||
14/04/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |