|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
10/09/1961 | Britannia class 7s | The remaining 12 B.R. Britannias on the W.R. (70016/8/9/20/2-9) (from 88A, Cardiff Canton) were transferred to the L.M.R. on 10th September. In the small hours of that morning 6 went light-engine to Shrewsbury, one worked a freight to Shrewsbury and another the 7-10 a.m. to London. Two more (70019/26) were at that time stopped at Worcester and Swindon and will presumably go direct from there. 70023/4 were retained in service against non-arrival of replacements and finally worked the 8-55 a.m. passenger and 12-55 a.m. freight to Shrewsbury respectively on 13th September. In replacement, Canton has been allocated 4083, 5020/53/73/91/6, 6010/24 an 7016 together with seven Halls. The two Kings are to strengthen the power on the Shrewsbury road. There are indications that this is only a part of re-arrangements involving redistribution of steam power from the west of England as 5058 (ex Laira) was observed in transit to Gloucester the same weekend. 70025/7/8 subsequently arrived at Bescot and are working goods and mineral trains. 70026 arrived at Aston. | SLS/196110 |
04/02/1962 | Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) | Paint Shop: Closed indefinitely through £50 damage being wilfully caused to paintwork of D58 by a singularly irresponsible visitor in a party on 28/1/62. Outside Paint Shop: D62/3, 45436, 45660/99, 48555. New Erecting Shop: D4/6/7, D64, D213/7/31/4/88, D317. Erecting Shop: D50-5/65-7, D237, D8044, 42150, 42484, 42550, 42617, 44661/94, 44713, 44839, 44904, 45051/8/76/8, 45144, 45209/50, 45412, 45606/48, 45723, 46106/36/8/69, 46231/6, 46420, 48039, 48366, 48478, 48503, 49277, 70029, 78039, 90190, 90245/57/61/85, 92028/77/81/3, 92111/57. Erecting Shop Yard: 42280, 45208, 45304/5/15, 46257, 52312, 90096, 90665, 92076. Works Sidings: 41239, 42445, 44709/35/70, 44870/3/95, 45093, 45211, 45494, 45522, 45642/5/52/76, 46249/56, 46431, 47334, 47580, 47631, 48325, 48400, 48550, 48624, 48708, 78036, 90125, 92089. Scrap Road: Nil. | SLS/196203 |
14/11/1965 | Crewe Works (Main Erecting shop) | Main Erecting shop: 42249, 44690, 44761, 45021/150, 48176/214/53/78/92, 48544, 48775, 70010/25/6/9/53. 92012, D181, D208/15/21/89/97, D311/32/82/98, D1518/32/42/50/7/60/7/84/97, D1980-9. Electric shop: E3014/45/7/51/86, 26002/8, 27002. New Diesel Repair Shop: D153, D1534/70/82, D1683, D1717/76, D1843/60. Test Area: D1536/72, D1976, D5705/14. Traverser Area: 45421, 48545, 70013, 26027, E3060, D376/7, D1516/23/8/68, D1646/89, D1715, D1849, D5244, D5716. Side of Works: 48744, 70047, 92117/228, E3052. Paint shop: D1974/5/7/8/9, 46235, D305/58, E3054/97, D5709. Outside paint shop: 44809, 48033, 92063 re-painted, D347, D1541, D1634, D1770, D5710. | SLS/196512 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/11/1952 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 70029, name: SHOOTING STAR Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) |
||
29/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) | ||
10/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aston (21D) | ||
10/10/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) | ||
07/11/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) | ||
17/12/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) | ||
21/10/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 70029 | ||
27/02/1968 | Scrapped | Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston |