|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
08/10/1961 | Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) | Paint Shop: D122-6, 42604/68, 44729/59, 44928, 45210/61, 45594, 45635/98, 46427, 49395 and the usual preserved locos. Outside Paint Shop: D127, 42447, 42655, 44733, 45077, 45316, 45699, 46225, 78017, 92133. New Electing Shop: D8, D128/9/35-7, D327, D5016/74. Outside New Erecting Shop: D5, D227, D329. Erecting Shop: D130-4, D224, 41209/39, 42050/62, 42289/99, 42465, 42607, 44666/93, 44774, 44836/90, 44934/90, 45003/67, 45102/5/8, 45204/52/62/3, 45332/40, 45454, 45549/50, 45688/90, 46114/43, 46234, 46426, 48036/46/74/85, 48283, 48494, 48611/53, 48712, 49025/70, 49381, 70052, 71000, 90216/42/71, 90486, 92013/81/94, 92150. Outside Erecting Shop: D216, 42446, 42656, 45131, 45505, 45634/83, 48717, 78043, 92123. Minor Repair Road: 45646, 48451. Works Sidings: 41279, 42425, 42574, 44708/17/20/36/7/71, 44864/71, 45154, 45571/96, 45656, 46105/7/38/60, 46406, 48088, 48217, 48477, 48624/36, 49126, 90529/61. Scrap Yard: 40075/7/97, 40118, 42506, 43325, 47421/38/62, 47634, 52389 intact. Works Shunters: D3175, 43957, 44127, 44374, 47592, 47608, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441. | SLS/196111 |
15/10/1961 | Crewe Works (Outside Paint Shop) | Paint Shop: D124-8, 42667/8, 44679/82/3, 44729/30, 45131, 45210, 45594, 45698, 46108/60, 49395, 78043. Outside Paint Shop: D123, 41209, 42425, 42656, 44696, 44774, 44893/4, 44988, 45108, 45262, 45635/56, 48085, 48283, 48477, 48717, 49025, 49125, 70052, 71000, 92081. Works Sidings: 42619/65, 44845, 45041, 45204/85, 45549, 46425, 47448, 48660, 49070, 49381, 90218, 92024/67. Erecting Shop: D8, D129-34, 41209/79, 42050, 42289/99, 42436/65, 42607/31, 44666/93/5, 44708/17/37, 44864/76/90, 44934/90, 45038/67, 45105, 45207/52/95, 45332, 45420, 45505/50/71/3, 45688/90, 45740. 46105/7, 48036/46/74, 48217, 48365, 48451, 48611/24/36/53, 48712, 49423, 90121, 90216/42/71, 90486, 90561, 92119/50. Outside Erecting Shop: D5141, 42062, 45003, 45102, 45263, 45340, 45454, 45646, 46113/43, 46234, 46426, 48494, 92013. New Erecting Shop: D135-7, D227, D327, D5016. Outside New Erecting Shop: D329. Scrap Yard-intact: 40075/7/97, 47421/38/62, 47634 intact. Scrap Yard-just cut up: 40118, 42506, 43325, 43863, 52389. Works Shunters: 43957, 44127, 44374, 47592, 51446, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441/59, D3763. | SLS/196111 |
03/08/1963 | August Bank Holiday Saturday at Shrewsbury | I (C. H. Rodway. - SLS) decided that on August Bank Holiday Saturday this year to visit Shrewsbury to see how much steam working was left on Express Passenger Trains. Having not been to Shrewsbury for two years I was particularly anxious to film some steam engines working whilst there was still a chance. I was agreeably surprised to find, despite dieselisation, a considerable amount of steam was on long distance passenger trains. In the main most of the steam hauled passenger trains were being worked by Halls or Granges and the trains off the Crewe line were, as two years ago, a mixed bag. The first Class 8P of the day was 46248 City of Leeds which arrived on the 8-22 a.m. Manchester-Penzance. The pacific came off and was replaced by D821. The next train in, off the Crewe line, was the 8-45 a.m. Liverpool to Kingswear which arrived behind 45417 of Cricklewood. The Class 5 was detached and the substitute was the only Castle of the day. This was 5085 Evesham Abbey and was in a rather grimy condition. Another Class 5 which was a bit off its beaten track was 45302 of Northampton which arrived on the 9-15 a.m. Blackpool to Cardiff. Two Britannia Class 7Ps were seen, 70054 Dornoch Firth which was on the 9-20 a.m. Liverpool-Plymouth and 70052 Firth of Tay which took the 7-35 a.m. Cardiff-Blackpool forward from Shrewsbury. Only one 'Royal Scot' was observed, this was 46141 on the 10-25 a.m. Manchester-Bournemouth and it proceded to some point south of Shrewsbury. However, it could not have gone far as it returned on the 9-28 a.m. Bournemouth-Liverpool/Manchester. Shortly after this engine had passed on its return journey the second pacific put in an appearance, this was 46256 Sir William Stanier, F.R.S. which worked the 9-18 a.m. Exmouth-Manchester forward from Shrewsbury. The only County observed was 1013 County of Dorset which arrived on the 7-30 a.m. Paignton-Manchester 11 minutes early. The County was replaced by Jubilee 45590, one of the two seen working passenger trains, the other being 45591 which took the 12-10 Paddington-Birkenhead forward from Shrewsbury. 45699 Galatea was incidentally the station pilot engine. Two Class 8Fs were noted on passenger trains, 48418 on the 12-27 p.m. to Swansea Victoria and 48507 which brought the 10-15 a.m. Swansea Victoria to Crewe into Shrewsbury. Only two types of diesel engines were seen, the Western Class on trains to and from the Paddington line and Warships on trains to and from the Hereford line. The only exception to this was D1067 which arrived on the 11-05 a.m. Swansea-Manchester. The report would not, I feel, be complete without some reference to the time-keeping. This was, in the main, very good with most trains arriving no more than 5 minutes late. The only train that was seriously late during the morning was the 9-05 a.m. Birkenhead-Poole which arrived 29 minutes late behind Hall 6934. In consequence the 9-20 Liverpool-Plymouth was delayed a few minutes making connection. After then the timekeeping was good until late afternoon when the Bournemouth trains were about 20 minutes late and I suspect that the first one had been delayed by the 12-10 p.m. from Paddington which was 19 minutes late arriving. The Hereford line trains had up to that time been excellent but as I returned on the 2-45 p.m. from Birkenhead I was unable to record what time the 6-10 a.m. Penzance-Liverpool arrived, or what the punctuality of the ensuing trains were like. When I left at 4-54 there was no sign of the 6-10 a.m. from Penzance which was due at 4-00 p.m. |
SLS/196311 |
11/09/1966 | Crewe Works (Traverser Area) | Erecting Shop: 44658, 44680, 44807, 44839/64, 45134/449, 60007, 70039, 73069, 90318/65, 92234, E3004/35/9/45, D216/8/46, D328, D368, D370/4, D391, D1104-11, D1583/8, D1600/8/10/3/86, D1762/76, D1865; Electric Shop: E3018/38/44/54, 26055; Adjacent to Electric Shop: D204/37, D311, D1515/20/46, D1663/80, D1761, D1858/9/81, D1915, D5105, D5107/11, D5711/4, 27005; Test Area: D222/3/74, D336/43, D1501, D1688, D1727/69/96, D5246, D5717, D8049; Traverser Area: D217, D322, D1503, D1627/53/67/72, D1764, D1876, D1904, D8000/7, 26017, 70052, 71000. At side of Works: 45131/8, 70006/17, 90265/396, D1604, D1782, D1812, D5710. Paint Shop: D367, D1103, D5709, E3008, 44776, 44800, 60010, 26037. | SLS/196610 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
21/08/1954 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 70052, name: FIRTH OF TAY Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Polmadie (66A) |
||
21/04/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A) | ||
29/05/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) | ||
02/10/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Banbury (2D) | ||
08/01/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) | ||
01/04/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 70052 | ||
10/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie |