Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 4283 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17689 Week
» 70705 Month
» 190232 Year
» 3217085 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7007 |
18/10/1961 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over green with light green skirting, white window surrounds |
18/10/1961 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
BSYP |
BR Blue bodywork, small yellow warning panel |
by 10/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/10/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/10/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7007 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 7901 Allocated to Westbury (82D) |
|
|
14/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, small yellow warning panel |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
19/04/1972 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7007 from Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
06/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|