Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 60 Today
» 1097 Yesterday
» 2329 Week
» 21230 Month
» 21230 Year
» 1686606 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 7014 on 16/07/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
16/07/1948 CAERHAYS CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 367
To Service Sat 16/07/1948 to Swindon (SDN)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 06/02/1965 off Tyseley (2A)
Scrapping During 05/1965 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 16 yrs, 6 mths , 21 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Hawksworth 4,000g 4001 16/07/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2623 14/06/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2869 20/03/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2862 11/07/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4044 06/01/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4114 04/07/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2388 13/05/1957 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2570 27/02/1959 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4009 03/12/1960 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2734 05/05/1961 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2386 25/02/1963 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SDN Swindon (New) on 16/07/1948
BRD Bristol Bath Road m/e 08/1948
87E Landore on 16/09/1960
82B St Philips Marsh on 03/10/1960
81A Old Oak Common on 08/08/1961
84A Stafford Road on 15/06/1962
2B Oxley on 09/09/1963
2A Tyseley on 27/06/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 06/02/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 31/07/1948
1STALLOC BRD Bristol Bath Road m/e 31/08/1948
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 24/03/1956
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 05/10/1960
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 09/09/1961
ALLOC 84A Stafford Road 4w/e 14/07/1962
ALLOC 84B St Blazey 5w/e 07/09/1963
ALLOC 2A Tyseley 5w/e 11/07/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
16/07/1948 Diagram HC boiler fitted
14/06/1950 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7603)
20/03/1952 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7624)
06/01/1954 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7640)
04/07/1955 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7641)
13/05/1957 Diagram HD boiler fitted (number 7645)
27/02/1959 Double Chimney fitted
05/05/1961 Diagram HD boiler fitted (number 9603)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 11/05/1950 14/06/1950 35 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7603 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2623 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
104837
Swindon Works 14/02/1952 20/03/1952 36 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 7624 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2869 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
193613
Swindon Works 01/12/1953 06/01/1954 37 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 7640 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4044 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
299419
Swindon Works 23/05/1955 04/07/1955 43 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7641 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4114 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
379631
Swindon Works 29/12/1956 13/05/1957 136 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7645 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 2388 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
472351
Swindon Works 30/12/1958 27/02/1959 60 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2570 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
Double Chimney fitted
569916
Swindon Works 14/03/1961 05/05/1961 53 days Heavy General
Boiler number 9603 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 2734 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
672827
Swindon Works 31/12/1962 25/02/1963 57 days Light Intermediate
Tender number 2386 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
746160

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/07/1948 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during July included: Nos 1367, 1446, 2165, 2229/36, 2385, 2809/84/98, 3778, 3832/40/59, 4075/82, 4519/28/73/85, 4698, 4965/77/88, 5077, 5191, 5261, 5306, 5403, 5805, 5904/15/43, 6157, 6343/78, 6439, 6637, 6702, 6818/25/33/46/55, 7006, 7218, 7318, 7727, 7812, 8764/87, 9312/17, 9706/81;
New work: Nos. 7014 BRD and 7015 SDN, both are painted G.W.R. green, as is No. 7016; the construction Of Nos. 4160-79 and 7430-39 is under way. During W/E 24/7 Nos. 5023, 6009 an 6910 were ex Works after having been in for the new British Railways' crest to be placed on the tenders, while during W/E 31/7 No. 5954 was ex general repair, having been painted black and lined out in red, cream and grey together with the new crest on the tender. During W/E 14/8 Nos. 7016 Chester Castle CDF and 7430 STB were completed; No. 8393 also entered Works during this week.
It is understood that the next batch of 'Castle's' (Nos. 7018-27) has been cancelled. Works' pilots lately have been and are: Nos. 906, 1758, 1900 an 2751; The following locomotives came in for cutting-up during W/E 24/7: Nos. 2680, 3002/27, 4386, 5127 an 5349
SLS/194809
30/12/1962 Western Regionboundary changes The following former W.R. engines were transferred to the L.M. Region when the depots to which they are allocated became the responsibility of that Region on 1.1.63. The official date of the transfer is December 30th, 1962: D3004/25-9/34-9, D3105-13/5/6/91-4, D3752/5/7, D3950-2/6-8/68-70/73-85/8/95-7, 1002/13/6/9/23/5, 1432/58, 1619/28/32/8/60/3/8, 2210/1/36/89 2845/51/6/66/75/88, 3208/9/17, 3601/5/7/19/25/31/58/60/73, 3709/44/9/70/6/8/82/8/9/92, 3802/6/9/13/5/7/21/5/8/9/31/45/6/9/52/5/7/65, 4105/11/4/20/5/33/40/7-9/53-5/8/65/7/8/71-3/5/6/8/9, 4602/17/45/6/8/65/83/7/96, 4923/46/54/98, 5022/6/31/63/89, 5101/53, 5192, 5606/40/58, 5927/42/83/90/1/4/5, 6129, 6314/64, 6403/24, 6604/9-11/5/8/25/31/2/44/6/63/7/8/71/4/8/9/83/92/4/8, 6803/11/23/7/8/30/1/3/9/42/5/51/3-5/7/8/61/2/4/6/70/1/9, 6903/4/6/7/11/5/6/7/22/5/6/9/30/3/4/52/64/71/6/9/80, 7001/12/4/9/24/6, 7207/18/36, 7414/8/24/6/31/43. 7800-3/6/7/9/10/2/8/9/21-4/7/8, 7905/8/12/5/8/29, 8109, 8464/98, 8718, 9435/63/70/98, 9608/10/3/4/24/30/6/9/46/57/69, 9724/33/53/68/74/82/93, 41201-4/9/31/2/40/1/85, 44835, 45143/5/90, 45283/98, 45406/22, 45572/7, 45660/99, 46401, 46503-27, 48330/47/54/69/402/4/10/2/5/7/8/24/30/6/50/9/60/71/4/5/8, 48724/38/9/68, 73025 6/34-6/90/5/7, 75000/2-4/6/9/20/1/3/4/6/7/9, 78000/2/3/7/8, 80070/8-80/96/8/100/l/2/4/5/31/2/5/6, 82000/3/5/6/9/20/1/31-4, 92001, 92212/3/5/27/8/34/47. SLS/196303

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
16/07/1948 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 7014, name: CAERHAYS CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Swindon (SDN)
Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g
Diagram HC boiler fitted
   
08/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD)    
11/07/1953 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2862    
16/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
03/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
03/12/1960 Tender Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4009    
08/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
15/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford Road (84A)    
09/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Oxley (2B)    
27/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (2A)    
06/02/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 7014 from Tyseley (2A)    

prev prev