Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1692 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15098 Week
» 68114 Month
» 187641 Year
» 3214494 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7017 |
08/01/1962 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
35 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
B-B |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Number |
BP3040 |
Works Number |
7911 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4616 | AWS | Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
To Service |
08/01/1962 to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
Withdrawn |
13/03/1975 |
Time in Service |
13 yrs, 2 mths , 5 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over green with light green skirting, white window surrounds |
08/01/1962 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 03/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
02/03/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/01/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
03/1974 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
WR ATC |
|
|
02/03/1974 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
WR ATC |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/01/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7017 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 7911 Allocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
11/05/1973 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
02/03/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
13/03/1975 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7017 |
|
|