Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1909 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15315 Week
» 68331 Month
» 187858 Year
» 3214711 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7048 |
26/09/1962 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green with small yellow panels and light green skirting, white window surrounds |
26/09/1962 |
BSYP |
BR Blue bodywork, small yellow warning panel |
01/1968 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/09/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/09/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7048 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 7952 Allocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
04/05/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
30/06/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
01/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, small yellow warning panel |
|
|
09/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
04/04/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
22/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
01/01/1972 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7048 from Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
08/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|