Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 49 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17852 Week
» 70868 Month
» 190395 Year
» 3217248 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7058 |
28/11/1962 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
35 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
B-B |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Number |
BP3039 |
Works Number |
7962 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Spanner Mk 3 | AWS | Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
To Service |
28/11/1962 to Cardiff Canton (88A) |
Withdrawn |
03/10/1971 |
Time in Service |
8 yrs, 10 mths , 5 dys |
Cut Up |
06/1972 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green with small yellow panels and light green skirting, white window surrounds |
28/11/1962 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/11/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/11/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7058 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 7962 Allocated to Cardiff Canton (88A) |
|
|
28/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
14/11/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
22/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
14/08/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
03/10/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7058 |
|
|
06/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|