|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
27/07/1961 | Ex-LNWR 0-8-0 in Scotland | Ex-LNWR 0-8-0 49104 was noted leaving Carstairs on 27th July hauling 72002; it was noted at Polmadie the next day and again on 2nd August at Flemington on a southbound goods. All correspondents aver that this is the first occasion an ex-LNW 0-8-0 has visited Glasgow. | SLS/196109 |
14/04/1963 | Polmadie MPD (in store) | in steam-45663, 46166, 46222/42/9 with 46230 under repair, and in store-46105/7/21, 46227, 72000-4 an 45098. | SLS/196304 |
18/01/1964 | Darlington Works (Stripping Shop) | Erecting Shop: 12122, D191, D2615, D3143, D3672, D5102/9, D5370/6, and 0-4-0 Depl. Diesel No. 56, D7583-89 under construction. Steam Locos under repair: 75037, 60004, 60145, 60923/70, 73092/142/162, 75046/53, 90120/709. Stripping Shop: 47482 for general, 63451, 72002, 75006, 90209/578/728. Yard Sidings: D16, D2700, D5112, 43119, 60132, 61013, 60954, 62060/65, 63468, 65033/99, 65804, 73144, 75006/40, 90026. Diesel Test House: D22, D5104 an D5169. Scrap Yard: 43131, 42770, 61468, 65810, 67652, 68008/38/39/41/42/59/61, 68736, 69006/21 an 72001. | SLS/196402 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
14/01/1952 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 72002, name: CLAN CAMPBELL Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Polmadie (66A) |
||
26/10/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) | ||
10/05/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) | ||
21/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) | ||
09/04/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) | ||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 72002 | ||
09/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |