Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 1 Online
» 305 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18108 Week
» 71124 Month
» 190651 Year
» 3217504 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
72004 |
on |
02/02/1952 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
66A |
Polmadie |
on |
02/02/1952 |
ALLOC |
64A |
St Margarets |
4w/e |
21/11/1959 |
ALLOC |
66A |
Polmadie |
4w/e |
09/04/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
29/12/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
14/04/1963 |
Polmadie MPD (in store) |
in steam-45663, 46166, 46222/42/9 with 46230 under repair, and in store-46105/7/21, 46227, 72000-4 an 45098. |
SLS/196304 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/02/1952 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 72004, name: CLAN MACDONALD Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (68A) |
|
|
21/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
09/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
29/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 72004 |
|
|
09/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |
|
|