|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
06/07/1961 | Cowlairs Works (Works Yard) | Stripping Shop: 61342, 65902. Erecting Shop: 11713, 61132/97, 64864, 65903, 72005/9, 73078, 73120/51, 76097, 80124, 90097, GNS49. Works Yard: D2584, 72006. Works Shunters: D3393, 65228. Scrap Road: 40627, 56308, 64523, 64892, 67612. Waiting Works: 61101, 61341, 65915, 90542, 90753.Ex-Works : 90640. | SLS/196108 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
27/02/1952 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 72006, name: CLAN MACKENZIE Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (68A) |
||
26/10/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) | ||
19/04/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) | ||
10/05/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) | ||
21/05/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 72006 | ||
11/08/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston |