Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1962 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15368 Week
» 68384 Month
» 187911 Year
» 3214764 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D73 |
25/11/1960 |
|
TOPS (45/1) |
45110 |
12/07/1973 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
45 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Box No Gangway |
|
To Service |
25/11/1960 to Crewe North (5A) |
Withdrawn |
27/07/1988 |
Time in Service |
27 yrs, 8 mths , 2 dys |
Cut Up |
13/06/1990 |
Cut At |
MC Metals (Springburn) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
02/1968 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1968 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
07/1973 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
07/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/11/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
07/1973 |
ve |
Vacuum brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
14/09/1962 |
Severe |
|
Train heating boiler burners |
Not known |
|
|
07/01/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/11/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D73 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
31/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
07/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
07/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
09/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
12/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood West (14B) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
07/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
07/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
12/07/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45110 |
|
|
27/07/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45110 |
|
|
13/06/1990 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|