|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
13/06/1951 | Derby Works | New construction of class 5MT up to 73008, latter being frame only. 73005 in paint shop, others in course of construction. Diesels complete up to 12091, 12092 having motors on so far. Little change of stored engines. On works were 40546 an 41049, both damaged, 44102 (71H), 53810 (71G); 58285 (3B) for special examination. | SLS/195108 |
30/06/1951 | New engines for the Scottish Region | New engines built at Crewe for the Scottish Region are Class 5MT Nos. 73005, W/E 23/6 and 73006 (63A) and 30/6 respectively. | SLS/195108 |
14/07/1951 | Derby Works | During the first half of July new 5MT 73000/5/6/7 went back into works for modification to drawgear; others were laid down up to 73012, also frames of diesel 12094. Into shops: 2159 (86G), 40011, 40472, 40508, 40629, 681, 40925, 41044, 41079, 41803/13, 41901, 42141, 42218 (33A), 42323, 42390 (87K), 43235/90, 43631, 43792 (71H), 43987, 44039, 44162, 44467, 44589, 45183 (84G), 47353, 47440/6, 47585, M7603, 47607, 58077, 22951, 64712/55 (39A), 64768 (30A). 40508, 41044 and 58077 were in for special examination. Where sheds are quoted, the locos. are other than L.M.R. stock. In works yard (withdrawn): 1781, 1856, 3617 (58296), 58237, 58302. Stored near station: 40411/6/26, 43312/68, 43469/96, 43574, 58163. Off works: 12015, 40012, 40396, 40402/44/86, 40583, 40935, 41078/87, 42141, 42218, 42317/84, 42411, 42525, 43218, 43331, 43787, 43907/76, 44102/23/34, 44268, 47266, 47357, 47547/89/95, 47611, 53810, 58040, 58300, 64796, 64887. Of these 40583, 42525:43907, 47357 and 53810 are still lettered L.M.S, and 40396 now has tall Stanier chimney in place of previous L.M.S. lipped pattern. | SLS/195109 |
03/08/1951 | Standard Class 5MT | The Royal Train was hauled through Forfar on 3rd August by two standard class 5MT locomotives, 73005 an 73006. Both are shedded at Perth and have been working between that city and Aberdeen. Just over a week later, 73009 worked the test train, the 17.30 from Aberdeen to Glasgow, made up to 407 tons. She was 4 minutes down at Stonehaven (p.w.s. and signals), but regained 3 minutes to Forfar. The Shed Master at Forfar is Bill Sharp, an old Caley man, and all locomotives allocated there are spotless, inside and out. | SLS/195111 |
30/08/1961 | Cowlairs Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D2708/70/4, 44783, 45213, 45361, 61324/46/96, 65919, 80030, 90017, 90386, 90463, 90614. Valve Shop: 73077. Stripping Shop: 65923. Weigh House: 64847. Paint Shop: 73099. Works Yard: D2434, D2726, D3393, 44485, 61178, 64932, 72009, 73005, 80045, 90753. Scrap Yard: 64710 intact, 64700 being out-up. Works Shunters: D2760, D3418. | SLS/196110 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
20/06/1951 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 73005 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Perth South (63A) |
||
19/01/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A) | ||
26/06/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 73005 | ||
10/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |