14/07/1951 |
Derby Works |
During the first half of July new 5MT 73000/5/6/7 went back into works for modification to drawgear; others were laid down up to 73012, also frames of diesel 12094. Into shops: 2159 (86G), 40011, 40472, 40508, 40629, 681, 40925, 41044, 41079, 41803/13, 41901, 42141, 42218 (33A), 42323, 42390 (87K), 43235/90, 43631, 43792 (71H), 43987, 44039, 44162, 44467, 44589, 45183 (84G), 47353, 47440/6, 47585, M7603, 47607, 58077, 22951, 64712/55 (39A), 64768 (30A). 40508, 41044 and 58077 were in for special examination. Where sheds are quoted, the locos. are other than L.M.R. stock. In works yard (withdrawn): 1781, 1856, 3617 (58296), 58237, 58302. Stored near station: 40411/6/26, 43312/68, 43469/96, 43574, 58163. Off works: 12015, 40012, 40396, 40402/44/86, 40583, 40935, 41078/87, 42141, 42218, 42317/84, 42411, 42525, 43218, 43331, 43787, 43907/76, 44102/23/34, 44268, 47266, 47357, 47547/89/95, 47611, 53810, 58040, 58300, 64796, 64887. Of these 40583, 42525:43907, 47357 and 53810 are still lettered L.M.S, and 40396 now has tall Stanier chimney in place of previous L.M.S. lipped pattern. |
SLS/195109 |
21/07/1951 |
Highland Section (Aviemore) |
Boat of Garten has now lost its Highland originality because the week ending 21st July saw all the Highland signals replaced by upper quadrants except for the Northern approach gantry. On Saturday, 14th July (Glasgow Fair) a special came through containing a Southern Region 3rd corridor in malachite green. The Sunday up and down Inverness-Perth via Forres contained an ex-Midland Pullman Restaurant Car in new livery. Two Cal. 4-4-0's ex-works, Nos. 54466/9 from Aviemore are in store in the G.N.S. shed at the Boat. A visit to Inverness 60A proved fruitless for H.R. Locos, except for Clan Goods 57954 under repair. Class 5's were of course numerous. Aviemore: On 28th July, end of Glasgow Fair, the heavily loaded Inverness-Glasgow direct was piloted to Aviemore by standard class 5 73007. The Edinburgh portion of the morning Inverness-South via Forres and the Edinburgh from Inverness direct portion left one hour late with 12 heavily loaded cars behind a single class five which was not assisted at all. The Edinburgh and Glasgow portions of these trains do not generally divide till Perth-½ hour of the time was made up to Perth. Perth: Glasgow Fair weekend provided a goodly number of specials, the restaurant car schedules going to pieces. On 28th July, eight Western Region coaches, including one in new livery, arrived in Perth in the afternoon from the South. A number of Western and Southern luggage vans have been seen in this section recently. The cleaning of class 5's in the area is better than it used to be, one or two looking very nice. |
SLS/195109 |
14/06/1952 |
Scottish Miscellany |
On a trip round the north, quite a variety of locomotives was noted, 55218 was on Aberfeldy Br., No. 44931 was pilot to 54500, 54494 on Up pass. at Murthly and 54467 at Pitlochry. No. 62262 was shunting at Elgin, 54473/82 at Forres, and at Inverness 54445/63/70/1/84 an 57634, 57954 an 73007. 55051 was at Dornoch and it is said locally that C.E. Dept. is to consider possibility of C.R. 0-4-4T as branch engine is getting worn-out. Helmsdale provided 54495, 57587 an 55053, the Dornoch Branch spare engine. Kyle of Lochalsh had only Class 5 LM 4-6-0. The early morning mixed train from Kyle to Dingwall is generally a LM 5MT, brake composite and a string of wagons. Bl, No. 61140 with self-weighing tender is due in Scotland for test purposes. 'Clan' Class engines have been noted working to Stirling and probably beyond. |
SLS/195208 |
16/06/1963 |
Derby Works (Foundry Row) |
Erecting Shop-No. 1 bay: 41531 cut up, 41535, 73001/32, 75012, D147, D2396, D2507, D2911, D3017/21/3/56/68, D3305, ED6/7; Erecting Shop-No. 2 bay-D3, D46, D62, D5008, D5133/48; Erecting Shop-No. 3 bay-D5215-21, D7568-73. Finishing Shop: D81, D116/9, D5010. Paint Shop: 75064, D5213/4. Diesel Erecting Shop: D34, D52, D75, D97, D112, D134/5, D141, D160, D5024/82. Test House: D109, D5012/4/32/86, D5138, D5213. Yard (by paint shop): 42178, D2, D4, D6, D7, D42/3, D72, D98, D114, D131, D149, D154, D3122, D5002/9/13, D5142, D5206/10/1, ED4. Stone Pit: 63578, D2503. Foundry Row: 41537, 42472, 42500, 43599, 44417, 47341, 47429, 47465, 73007, 75011/50, D90. Stored outside offices: 43593, 43645, 43754, 47417, 10000/201/2/3. |
SLS/196307 |
12/07/1963 |
Derby Works (Foundry Row) |
Erecting Shop: No. 1 Bay-47341, 47429, 47673, 73032, 75011, 75012, 75050, D134, D2504, D2911, D3024, D3123, D5013, ED6, ED7. Erecting Shop: No. 2 Bay-D153, D5015, D5081, D5092, D5144. Erecting Shop: No. 3 Bay-(New) D5220, D5221, D5222, D5233, D7568, D7569, D7570, D7571, D7572, D7573, D7574, D7575, D7576, D7577 new. Finishing Shop: D97, D135, D5008, D5029, D5219. Paint Shop: D5217. Foundry Row: 41537, 42472, 42500, 43599, 48006, 48105/407, 73007/143, 75042, D2503. Diesel Erecting Shop: D42, D67, D79, D110, D115, D131, D136, D137, D141, D155, D5082. Yard by Paint Shop: D2, D3, D7, D56, D69, D72, D81, D124, D149, D154, ED4. Test House: D34, D91, D119, D5078, D218. Stone Pit: 73001, 73090, D5216. Stored outside offices: 10000, 10201/2/3. |
SLS/196308 |