Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 302 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 4279 Week
» 15516 Month
» 248436 Year
» 1913812 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway (Orig) 7301 m/e 12/1921

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 43xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 3833
To Service During 12/1921
Withdrawal Fri 21/09/1962
Service Life 40 yrs, 9 mths , 22 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1921
174   Tyseley on 01/01/1934 (Snapshot)
85C   Hereford 4w/e 23/02/1952
85C   Hereford 4w/e 31/03/1952
85A   Worcester 4w/e 18/04/1953
85D   Kidderminster 4w/e 16/05/1953
85C   Hereford 4w/e 30/01/1954
82B   St Philips Marsh 4w/e 13/07/1957
     Withdrawn on 21/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 85C Hereford 4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 18/04/1953
ALLOC 85D Kidderminster 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 85C Hereford 5w/e 30/01/1954
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 13/07/1957
WDN   m/e 30/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1951 Outside Steam Pipes fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1948 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during May included: Nos. 1903, 2031, 2808/89, 2924/36/37/54, 3827, 4021/22/32/51/80/89/91/96, 4386, 4938/40/92, 5010/21/23, 5158, 5258, 5317/36/74, 5526/48/59/65, 5914/68, 6001/11/25/29, 6369/89, 6426, 6807/71, 6900/06/27/29, 7007, 7301/15, 77028, 77429 an 78714. New work (May): Nos. 7008 OXF, 7009 LDR (the latter is fitted with smokebox number plate); D.E. 15103/04 PDN; 9667-70. No. 7010 is nearly ready (28/5) and is painted pea green, as also is No. 4089, which is undergoing a general repair. Nos. 6009/26 have been painted royal blue and lined out in grey, yellow and red. Works' pilots during the month were: Nos. 1713, 2730/49/81, 3561 and D.E. 15103/04. Locomotives condemned include: Nos. 3391, 2980 an 2988. SLS/194807
06/05/1951 Swindon Works 1646 just out, 8470 (YE Co. 2463/51) 9446 (RSH 7583/51) just delivered. Under construction: 1647 (boiler 1547 QA), 1649 (boiler 1549 QA). Frames of 75001 set up, those of 75002 awaiting erection. New tender, BR Type 2, No. 824/51, allocated to 75000. Withdrawals: 1925, the last saddle, had just arrived, 1993, 2026, 2936/47, (2947 was the only remaining 'Court' without out-side steam pipes); 3447/51 (3451 had been withdrawn from store) 4018/41/58. Being cut up in 'C' shop were, 1917, 2192, 4055. Recent top feed boilers observed: 5413, 5736, 4603, 9715/40. Outside steam pipes fitted: 2878, 6393, 7301. Experimental tests: 7916, still undergoing tests of mechanical lubricators, was in the barn, while 43094, with blast pipe modifications, was on the testing plant. Other observations: 5922 has now lost her electric lighting equipment. Of the 94XX received' from outside contractors, 8470 an 9444 were the first of their respective batches to have the red-backed number plates. Bagnalls have not delivered anything further since 8429, and it is believed that they are taking a three months' respite, in order to catch up on industrial and foreign orders. SLS/195107
31/07/1962 Withdrawn GWR engines It is understood that the following have been withdrawn and are lying at their home sheds mainly: 1004/26, 1462, 2200/29/56/71/94, 3211, 3623/30/88/94, 3741/50/83, 4037/99, 4102/6/16/8/29/52, 4236/91, 4557/67, 4906/9/13/7/21/34/7/41/4/7/8/52/60/7/9/84/99, 5007/8/11/6/7/9/21/30/2/3/4/6/45/6/7/52/61/4/6/8/75/88/94, 5190, 5357/99, 5520/5/44/50/4/62, 5617/31/46/98, 5746, 5910/1/7/8/26/30/1/40/59/64/6/73/80/1/2/99, 6001/2/7/9/12/4/5/6/9/21/2/6/7, 6146, 6330/42/62/6/88/91, 6617/30/40/1/7, 7300/1/5/11/6/21/31/6/41, 8449, 9785, 42385, 90355/6/565/693. LTE has 7749 on loan pending permanent transfer. SLS/196210

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1921 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 7301
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3833
   
01/01/1934 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Tyseley (174)    
04/1951 Modification Modification: Outside Steam Pipes fitted    
23/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Hereford (85C)    
31/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Hereford (85C)    
18/04/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
16/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (85D)    
30/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Hereford (85C)    
13/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
21/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 7301    

prev prev