Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1596 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15002 Week
» 68018 Month
» 187545 Year
» 3214398 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
73022 |
on |
26/10/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Riddles |
Class |
Standard Class 5 |
Company History |
BR |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sun 26/10/1951 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 16/04/1967 |
Service Life |
15 yrs, 5 mths , 21 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
12/08/1967 |
Salisbury MPD |
On 12th August, the following locomotives were in store at Salisbury (70E): USA 0-6-0T 30064/7/9/71/2, W/C Pacific 34102, WC/BB Pacific (Reb.) 34018/21/4/5/37/40/56/60/87/9/90/8, 34104/8, LMS 2-6-2T 41312/9, BR 5MT 4-6-0 73022/9/43/65/85/93, 73115/7/8/55, BR 4MT 4-6-0 75074/5/7, BR 4MT 2-6-0 76005/6/7/11/31/64/6/7, BR 4MT 2-6-4T 80015/6/133/9/40/3/5/6/51/2 and BR 3MT 2-6-2T 82019/29. |
SLS/196709 |
16/10/1967 |
Cashmore\'s, Newport (Mon.) |
Dumped locomotives: 34016, 34044, 35012, 73022. |
SLS/196712 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/10/1951 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 73022 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
03/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
26/12/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
30/01/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
17/07/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
13/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (71G) |
|
|
12/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
08/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
27/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
16/04/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 73022 |
|
|
09/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|