Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 25 Today
» 1001 Yesterday
» 2100 Week
» 27461 Month
» 260381 Year
» 1925757 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 73026 on 27/11/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 5
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 27/11/1951
Withdrawal w/e Sat 01/04/1967
Service Life 15 yrs, 4 mths , 5 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1967 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 27/11/1951
84G   Shrewsbury 4w/e 03/10/1953
86C   Cardiff Canton 4w/e 17/07/1954
6E   Chester West 4w/e 06/09/1958
84G   Shrewsbury w/e 11/04/1959
2L   Leamington w/e 24/10/1964
2A   Tyseley w/e 19/06/1965
9K   Bolton w/e 30/04/1966
     Withdrawn w/e 01/04/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 28A Blackpool Central w/e 01/12/1951
LOAN 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 03/10/1953
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 17/07/1954
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR m/e 30/09/1956
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 06/10/1956
LOAN 6E Chester West 4w/e 06/09/1958
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region m/e 30/09/1958
ALLOC 6E Chester West 4w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 18/04/1959
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR m/e 30/04/1959
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 5w/e 02/05/1959
ALLOC 2L Leamington 4w/e 07/11/1964
ALLOC 2A Tyseley 4w/e 10/07/1965
ALLOC 9K Bolton 4w/e 07/05/1966
WDN   w/e 01/04/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/05/1959 Chester MPD (6E) The W.R. has taken over all freight workings of this shed (now under LMR control) and as a result have gained back from the LMR all the locomotives transferred in exchange for W.R. types. Engines transferred LMR to WR to cover these freight workings are-48402/12/5/7/8/24/30/44/71, 73021/3/4/5/6, 75005/6/26. The only engines left at 6E now are several 82XXX tanks and a few standards. SLS/195907
04/07/1964 Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D32, D171/6/7/74/8, D5096, D5112/67, D7596/7, DEPT84, D2242/64, D2605, D3151, 60024, 61386, 62062, 65880, 73026/35, 75059/62, 90056/230/43/429/704, 90061. Stripping Shop: 43005, 60836/55, 61030, 63345/70, 90011. Paint Shop: D3675, 75017. Level Crossing: D25, D27, D169, D187. Works Yard: D170/80/9/91, D2163, D2700, 60011/20/527/844/910, 61038, 62002/41, 63460, 65053/99, 73133/55, 90233. Waiting Works: D2586, 60916, 61037, 63383, 63415/22/39, 69003/11/9/20, 90511. Ex Works. 43010/33. Stored: 68016/46/51/4. SLS/196408

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
27/11/1951 To Service To service as British Railways Number 73026
Built at Derby Works
   
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
17/07/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
06/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Chester West (6E)    
11/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
24/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (2L)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (2A)    
30/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (9K)    
01/04/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 73026    
10/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev