|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1954 | York MPD | J77 class 0-6-OT's, normally rare at York, were represented there in January by 68435 (53C) under repair at the north shed towards the end of the month, and 68401 (53B) shunting at Queen Street and later under repair at the south shed. On 1/1/54 65022 (Class J2) was noted 'dead' en route for breaking up at Darlington Works hauled by an 'Austerity' 2-8-0. By contrast new Diesel 13079 from Darlington came up light through York on 19/1/54. Other unusual visitors included 60519 (64B) ex-works on Doncaster turns into York on 16/1/54. One of the Westinghouse fitted Standard Class 5 4-6-0's from Derby, 73031, visited York on 6/1/54. The engine concerned in the derailment of the down 'Heart of Midlothian' at Thirsk on 20/1/54 was 60126 (52B) which was later noted 'dead' in York shed yard. On the evening of the derailment the down 'Aberdonian' and other expresses were diverted from York via Knaresborough, Bilton, and Ripon. 60080 (52B) failed at York on the 7.45 a.m. Newcastle-King's Cross express (non-stop from Darlington to Peterborough) on 25/1/54 and was replaced by the York south end pilot 60502 (50A) which went forward 34 minutes late. 60539 (52B) took over this working on the next day. |
SLS/195403 |
12/10/1962 | Derby Works (Erecting Shop) | Diesel Erecting Shop: ED3, D36, D46, D73, D87, D100/31/44/88, D5011/30/79, D5136, 10001. Test House: D75, D5033. Outside Test House: D45, D66, D77, D93/4, D165 (loco. that was turned on its side on strike day), D185, D3056, D5021/75. Outside Shunter Test House: ED6, D2236, D3292. New Building : D184, D190-D193, D5186-5191. Finishing Shop: D38, D186/7, D5142, Pullman uM60091. Erecting Shop: ED7, D55, D123, D189, D2507, D2859, D2908/10, 13304, 42080/96, 44137, 47000, 47319 (being cut-up), 48009, 48214/79/85/6, 73031, 75009/18/54. Paint Shop: M.R. 1000, 42212. Stone Pit: 48718, 58137/63/6. Foundry Row: 42388, 42500, 47554, 73016, 73157. Klondyke Sidings: D84, 44020, 44122/43, 44435, 47588 (last five locos. frames only). Bone Yard: 10201/3. Ex Works on Shed: 42081 (12C), 42100 (5A), 44139 (16A), 44414 (15C), 44420 (17A), 48007 (21A), 48109 (21A), 75037 (1E). Research Dept.: E3030/71/87. | SLS/196211 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/07/1953 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 73031 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Derby (17A) |
||
16/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (22A) | ||
25/01/1958 | Allocation | Loaned to Rugby Testing Station (RTS) | ||
02/12/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (82F) | ||
21/04/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gloucester Barnwood (85C) | ||
04/05/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) | ||
11/07/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Oxford (81F) | ||
10/09/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 73031 | ||
12/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |