Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1672 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19475 Week
» 72491 Month
» 192018 Year
» 3218871 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
73041 |
on |
14/10/1953 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/10/1953 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 73041 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
10/08/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holyhead (6J) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
26/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (71G) |
|
|
18/03/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
03/05/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (71G) |
|
|
14/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
08/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
20/06/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 73041 |
|
|
12/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: at Eastleigh Depot |
|
|