Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 898 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18701 Week
» 71717 Month
» 191244 Year
» 3218097 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
73062 |
on |
15/09/1954 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
66B |
Motherwell |
4w/e |
29/10/1955 |
ALLOC |
66A |
Polmadie |
4w/e |
13/07/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
26/06/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/09/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 73062 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
29/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Motherwell (66B) |
|
|
06/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
26/06/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 73062 |
|
|
11/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Old Kilpatrick |
|
|