Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 962 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 2036 Week
» 27397 Month
» 260317 Year
» 1925693 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 73069 on 06/11/1954

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 5
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 06/11/1954 to Derby (17A)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 10/08/1968
Service Life 13 yrs, 9 mths , 4 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1969 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
17A   Derby (New) on 06/11/1954
20A   Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 13/08/1955
15E   Leicester (G.C.) w/e 12/09/1959
14D   Neasden w/e 18/06/1960
15E   Leicester (G.C.) w/e 30/06/1962
2F   Woodford Halse w/e 16/02/1963
14A   Cricklewood East w/e 18/05/1963
2L   Leamington w/e 10/10/1964
2A   Tyseley w/e 19/06/1965
9K   Bolton w/e 30/04/1966
9H   Patricroft w/e 13/04/1968
10A   Carnforth w/e 06/07/1968
     Withdrawn w/e 10/08/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 17A Derby w/e 06/11/1954
ALLOC 20A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 13/08/1955
ALLOC 15E Leicester (G.C.) 3w/e 26/09/1959
ALLOC 14D Neasden 5w/e 02/07/1960
ALLOC 15E Leicester (G.C.) 4w/e 30/06/1962
ALLOC 2F Woodford Halse 4w/e 02/03/1963
ALLOC 14A Cricklewood East 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 2L Leamington w/e 10/10/1964
ALLOC 2A Tyseley 4w/e 10/07/1965
ALLOC 9K Bolton 4w/e 07/05/1966
ALLOC 9H Patricroft w/e 11/05/1968
ALLOC 10A Carnforth on 01/07/1968
WDN 10A Carnforth w/e 10/08/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
21/01/1963 Derby Works (Erecting Shop: No. 1 Bay) Diesel Erecting Shop: D35, D79, D85, D92, D102, D113, D159, D165, D303, D5008/10/23/5. Test House: D87, D125/6, D3567, D5000/22/76/89. Paint Shop: 73068/74. Diesel Finishing Shop: D152, D5018, D5186/7. Pullman Car uM60093. Erecting Shop: No. 1 Bay-41712 G, 44394, 47471, 47597/9, 73014/40/69, 75045/60, Erecting Shop: No. 2 Bay-D139, D2387, D2507, D2908, D3085, D5002/3, D5381, Erecting Shop: No. 3 Bay-D5188-5202 under construction, note correction of numbers from those quoted in last month's journal. Works Yard: 10000, 10201/2/3 all stored awaiting decision outside works offices, D8, D60/3, D72, D96, D110/4/8, D154, D5006/79/138, 42500, 43428, 44228 frames, 44260, ED6 an ED7 frames. SLS/196302
11/09/1966 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: 44658, 44680, 44807, 44839/64, 45134/449, 60007, 70039, 73069, 90318/65, 92234, E3004/35/9/45, D216/8/46, D328, D368, D370/4, D391, D1104-11, D1583/8, D1600/8/10/3/86, D1762/76, D1865; Electric Shop: E3018/38/44/54, 26055; Adjacent to Electric Shop: D204/37, D311, D1515/20/46, D1663/80, D1761, D1858/9/81, D1915, D5105, D5107/11, D5711/4, 27005; Test Area: D222/3/74, D336/43, D1501, D1688, D1727/69/96, D5246, D5717, D8049; Traverser Area: D217, D322, D1503, D1627/53/67/72, D1764, D1876, D1904, D8000/7, 26017, 70052, 71000. At side of Works: 45131/8, 70006/17, 90265/396, D1604, D1782, D1812, D5710. Paint Shop: D367, D1103, D5709, E3008, 44776, 44800, 60010, 26037. SLS/196610

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/11/1954 To Service To service as British Railways Number 73069
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Derby (17A)
   
13/08/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A)    
12/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (15E)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (14D)    
30/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (15E)    
16/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F)    
18/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A)    
10/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (2L)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (2A)    
30/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (9K)    
13/04/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (9H)    
06/07/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (10A)    
10/08/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 73069    
03/1969 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev