Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1351 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19154 Week
» 72170 Month
» 191697 Year
» 3218550 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
73116 |
on |
15/11/1955 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
15/11/1955 |
ISEUIT |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/11/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 73116, name: ISEUIT Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
27/08/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (71G) |
|
|
27/10/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
19/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (71G) |
|
|
08/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
12/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (82F) |
|
|
13/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (82F) |
|
|
05/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
14/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
29/11/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 73116 |
|
|
02/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Eastleigh |
|
|